EP0606337 - LOOP MACHINE FOR HELICALLY WINDING STRIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.1997 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.10.1997 [1997/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RIB LOC AUSTRALIA PTY. LTD. 22 Cavan Road Dry Creek South Australia 5094 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1994/29] | For all designated states RIB LOC AUSTRALIA PTY. LTD. 22 Cavan Road Dry Creek South Australia 5094 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENZEL, Stanley, William, Otto 22 Cavan Road Dry Creek, S.A. 5094 / AU | [1994/29] | Representative(s) | Denmark, James Bailey, Walsh & Co. 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD Yorkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/29] | Denmark, James Bailey, Walsh & Co. 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 92920751.2 | 30.09.1992 | [1994/29] | WO1992AU00523 | Priority number, date | AU19910008686 | 02.10.1991 Original published format: AU 868691 | [1994/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9306986 | Date: | 15.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0606337 | Date: | 20.07.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0606337 | Date: | 16.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 15.04.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B29C53/72 | [1994/29] | CPC: |
G02B6/508 (EP,US);
B29C53/72 (EP,US);
B29C53/78 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1994/29] | Title | German: | SCHLEIFENFÖRMIGE MASCHINE ZUM SCHRAUBENFORMIGEN ZUFUHREN VON EINEM BAND | [1994/29] | English: | LOOP MACHINE FOR HELICALLY WINDING STRIP | [1994/29] | French: | MACHINE A BOUCLE SERVANT A ENROULER DES BANDES EN HELICE | [1994/29] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.1994 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.1994 | Search fee paid | 24.03.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 24.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/29] | 22.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 16.01.1997 | [1997/39] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0266720 (AMETEX AG [CH]) [X] 1-3,8,16,17,19,20,22 * column 4, line 9 - line 35; figure 1 * | International search | [A]JP63056433 ; | [A]US4977931 (MENZEL STANLEY W O [AU]); | [A]EP0377227 (AMETEX AG [CH]); | [A]JP57025923 ; | [A]US4995929 (MENZEL STANLEY W O [AU]) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, M 725, page 18; & JP,A,63 056 433 (SEKISUI CHEM CO LTD) 11 March 1988 (11.03.88), Abstract, figure., & JP63056433 A 19880311 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, M 132, page 46; & JP,A,57 025 923 (MITSUI SEKIYU KAGAKU KOGYO K.K.) 10 February 1982 (19.02.82), Abstract, figure., & JP57025923 A 19820210 |