EP0611430 - BUTTERFLY VALVE WITH COMPOUND MOVEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.07.1998 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.1998 | Refusal of application | published on 16.09.1998 [1998/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHAPMAN, John Edward 23 Sophia Street Kingston, TAS 7050 / AU | [1994/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/34] | Representative(s) | Harris, Ian Richard D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/34] | Harris, Ian Richard c/o D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 92920754.6 | 02.10.1992 | [1994/34] | WO1992AU00530 | Priority number, date | AU19910008679 | 02.10.1991 Original published format: AU 867991 | [1994/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9307408 | Date: | 15.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0611430 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 15.04.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16K1/24 | [1995/05] | CPC: |
F16K1/24 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/34] | F16K1/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/34] | Title | German: | KLAPPE MIT KOMBINIERTER BEWEGUNG | [1994/34] | English: | BUTTERFLY VALVE WITH COMPOUND MOVEMENT | [1994/34] | French: | VANNE-PAPILLON A MOUVEMENT COMPOSE | [1994/34] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.1994 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.1994 | Search fee paid | 28.04.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 28.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/34] | 20.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.04.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1998/38] | 02.05.1998 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/38] | Request for further processing for: | 10.06.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 10.06.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.07.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1995 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   11.01.1996 | 31.10.1997 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]FR1184986 ; | [A]AU5070979 ; | [A]DE3535637 ; | [A]DE1926151 ; | [A]DE1076456 |