EP0572671 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING ARTIFICIAL BED LOG FOR SHIITAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.1997 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.11.1997 [1997/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEBO, LTD. 17-4 Sumida 5-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 131 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states KANEBO, LTD. 17-4 Sumida 5-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 131 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAUCHI, Masaaki 7-3-509, Kawanishi-cho Ashiya-shi, Hyogo 659 / JP | 02 /
MURATA, Hideo 4-18-12, Habikigaoka Habikino-shi, Osaka 583 / JP | 03 /
SASAKI, Yoshifumi 2-26-1, Yuyamadai Kawanishi-shi, Hyogo 666-01 / JP | [1993/49] | Representative(s) | Wakerley, Helen Rachael, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | Wakerley, Helen Rachael, et al Reddie & Grose, 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 92920900.5 | 30.09.1992 | [1993/49] | WO1992JP01249 | Priority number, date | JP19910280812 | 30.09.1991 Original published format: JP 28081291 | [1993/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9306708 | Date: | 15.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0572671 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0572671 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.04.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A01G1/04 | [1993/49] | CPC: |
A01G18/64 (EP,US);
A01G18/20 (EP,US);
A01G18/30 (EP,US);
A01G18/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, IT, NL, SE [1993/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES KÜNSTLICHES STAMMES FÜR DIE ZUCHT VON SHIITAKE | [1993/49] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING ARTIFICIAL BED LOG FOR SHIITAKE | [1993/49] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN TRONC ARTIFICIEL POUR LA CULTURE DES SHIITAKE | [1993/49] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.1993 | Translation filed | 23.06.1993 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.1993 | Search fee paid | 23.06.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/49] | 17.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.02.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 18.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/48] | Request for further processing for: | 26.02.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 27.02.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.03.1996 | Decision despatched | 26.02.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 26.02.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 20.03.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2181122 (KANEBO FOODS) [A] 1* page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 56; figures 1-3 * | International search | [A]JPS5362652 (FUJISAWA YOSHIAKI); | [A]JPH0284113 (HITACHI REINETSU KK); | [A]JPH0246167B |