EP0560967 - USE OF AICA RIBOSIDE COMPOUNDS FOR THE TREATMENT AND PREVENTION OF TISSUE DAMAGE DUE TO DECREASED BLOOD FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.11.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.1997 [1997/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENSIA, INC. 9360 Towne Centre Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [1995/26] |
Former [1993/38] | For all designated states GENSIA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 11025 Roselle Street San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRUBER, Harry, Edward 13083 Maritime Place San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 02 /
MULLANE, Kevin, Michael 13814 Boquita Drive Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | 03 /
LAIKIND, Paul, Kevin 3370 Goldfinch Street San Diego, CA 92013 / US | [1993/38] | Representative(s) | Sexton, Jane Helen, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/38] | Sexton, Jane Helen, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 92921355.1 | 28.09.1992 | [1993/38] | WO1992US08304 | Priority number, date | US19910770023 | 30.09.1991 Original published format: US 770023 | [1993/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9306833 | Date: | 15.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0560967 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/70 | [1993/38] | CPC: |
A61K31/70 (EP,US);
A61P9/00 (EP);
Y10S435/975 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/70, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/70, A61K31/52 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/07] |
Former [1993/38] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON AICA-RIBOSID VERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND VORBEUGUNG DER DURCH VERMINDERTE BLUTSTRÖMUNG VERURSACHTEN GEWEBESCHÄDEN | [1993/38] | English: | USE OF AICA RIBOSIDE COMPOUNDS FOR THE TREATMENT AND PREVENTION OF TISSUE DAMAGE DUE TO DECREASED BLOOD FLOW | [1993/38] | French: | UTILISATION DE COMPOSES DE AICA RIBOSIDES POUR LE TRAITEMENT ET LA PREVENTION DE DOMMAGES DE TISSUS DUS A UNE DIMINUTION DE L'ECOULEMENT SANGUIN | [1993/38] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Miscellaneous | EPB 1995/08: Verbunden mit 92308801.7/0535884 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) durch Entscheidung vom 05.01.95 | EPB 1995/08: Consolidated with 92308801.7/0535884 (European application no./publication no.) by decision dated 05.01.95 | EPB 1995/08: Jointe à la demande no. 92308801.7/0535884 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 05.01.95 | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.1993 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/38] | 08.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/03] | 19.08.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1996 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4575498 (HOLMES EDWARD W [US], et al); | [X]WO8705807 (GRUBER HARRY EDWARD); | [X]WO9009163 (GENSIA PHARMA [US]); | [XP]WO9202213 (GENSIA PHARMA [US]); | [XP]WO9202214 (GENSIA PHARMA [US]) | [XP] - Supplement to the Journal of the American College of Cardiology, vol. 19, no. 3, supplement A, 1 March 1992, J. LEUNG et al.: "Effects of acadesine on perioperative cardiac morbidity in a placebo controlled, double blind study", page 112A, see the whole document | [A] - Circulation, vol. 80, no. 5, November 1989, H.E. GRUBER et al.: "Increased adenosine concentration in blood from ischemic myocardium by AICA riboside", pages 1400-1411, see abstract | [XP] - Circulation, vol. 86, no. 2, August 1992, M. GALINANES et al.: "Acadesine and myocardial protection. Studies of time of administration and dose-response relations in the rat", pages 598-608, see abstract | [X] - Annals of Plastic Surgery, vol. 26, no. 6, June 1991, Little, Brown and Co., G.M. SALERNO et al.: "The use of 5-aminoimidazole-4-carboxamide riboside (AICA riboside) to improve random skin flap viability in the rat model", pages 544-550, see abstract |