EP0562124 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING PREVENTION OF DEFLECTION OF ROPE OF CRANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.12.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.01.1998 [1998/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA YASKAWA DENKI 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi Yahatanishi-Ku Kitakyushu-Shi Fukuoka 806 / JP | ||
Former [1993/39] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA YASKAWA DENKI 2-1, Kurosaki-shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIBATA, Naotake Tokyo-Branch, Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 6-1, Ohte-machi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [1993/39] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/06] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/39] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92921398.1 | 16.10.1992 | [1993/39] | WO1992JP01348 | Priority number, date | JP19910299740 | 18.10.1991 Original published format: JP 29974091 | [1993/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9308115 | Date: | 29.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0562124 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0562124 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.04.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B66C13/22, B66C13/06 | [1994/12] | CPC: |
B66C13/063 (EP,US);
B66C13/22 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1993/39] | B66C13/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1993/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DER VERHÜTUNG DES AUSSCHLAGS EINES KRANSEILS | [1993/39] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING PREVENTION OF DEFLECTION OF ROPE OF CRANE | [1993/39] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DESTINES A EMPECHER LA DEVIATION D'UN CABLE DE GRUE | [1993/39] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.1993 | Translation filed | 17.06.1993 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.1993 | Search fee paid | 17.06.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/50] | 04.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2005323 (GENERAL ELECTRIC) [A] 1,3,8,10 * page 2, line 19 - line 22 * * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 3 * * page 3, line 22 - page 5, line 28; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3513007 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 2,3,9,10 * page 10, line 11 - line 20; figure 3 * | [A] - E. OHNISHI ET AL., "Automatic control of an overhead crane", PROCEEDINGS OF THE EIGHTH TRIENNIAL WORLD CONGRESS OF THE INTERNATIONAL FEDERATION OF AUTOMATIC CONTROL, KYOTO, JAPAN, (19810824), vol. 4, pages 1885 - 1890 [A] 1,3,8,10 * figure 3 * | International search | [Y]JPS5437377B ; | [Y]JPS59203093 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JPS6044487 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JPS60106795 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) |