EP0608310 - CONCENTRATOR SOLAR CELL HAVING A MULTI-QUANTUM WELL SYSTEM IN THE DEPLETION REGION OF THE CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL COLLEGE OF SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY & MEDICINE Exhibition Road South Kensington London SW7 2AZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/31] | For all designated states IMPERIAL COLLEGE OF SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY & MEDICINE Exhibition Road London SW7 2AZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARNHAM, Keith Mayfield London Road Dorking Surrey RH4 1RH / GB | [1994/31] | Representative(s) | Shindler, Nigel Brookes Batchellor LLP 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/31] | Shindler, Nigel BATCHELLOR, KIRK & CO. 2 Pear Tree Court Farringdon Road London EC1R 0DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 92921571.3 | 19.10.1992 | [1994/31] | WO1992GB01913 | Priority number, date | GB19910022197 | 18.10.1991 Original published format: GB 9122197 | [1994/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9308606 | Date: | 29.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0608310 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0608310 | Date: | 26.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/075 | [1994/31] | CPC: |
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
H01L31/077 (EP,US);
H01L31/035236 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (US);
Y02E10/547 (EP);
Y02E10/548 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1994/31] | Title | German: | KONZENTRATOR-SOLARZELLE MIT MULTI-QUANTUM-WELL SYSTEM IN DER VERARMUNGSZONE DER ZELLE | [1997/13] | English: | CONCENTRATOR SOLAR CELL HAVING A MULTI-QUANTUM WELL SYSTEM IN THE DEPLETION REGION OF THE CELL | [1994/31] | French: | CELLULE PHOTOVOLTAIQUE COMPRENANT UN SYSTEME A PLUSIEURS PUITS QUANTIQUES DANS LA ZONE D'APPAUVRISSEMENT DE LA CELLULE | [1994/31] |
Former [1994/31] | KONZENTRATOR-SOLARZELLE MIT MULTI-QUANTUMWANNESYSTEM IN DER VERARMUNGSZONE DER ZELLE. | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.1994 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 29.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/31] | 22.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 26.03.1997 | LI | 26.03.1997 | NL | 26.03.1997 | [2003/07] |
Former [1998/04] | CH | 26.03.1997 | |
LI | 26.03.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4250515 (CHANG LEROY L [US], et al); | [A]US4255211 (FRAAS LEWIS M); | [X]US4688068 (CHAFFIN ROGER J [US], et al); | [A]US4975567 (BISHOP STEPHEN G [US], et al) | [X] - Journal of Applied Physics, Volume 67, No. 7, April 1990, (Woodbury, New York), K.W.J. Barnham et al, "A New Approach to High-Efficiency Multi-Bond-Gap Solar Cells" | [Y] - Applied Physics Letters, Volume 45, No. 3, August 1984, (New York), E. E. Mendez et al, "Temperature dependence of the electron mobility in GaAs-GaAlAs heterostructures" | Examination | - JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, vol. 67, no. 7, April 1990, Woodbury, NY, US, pp. 3490-3493; K.W.J. BARNHAM : "A new approach to high-efficiency multi-bond-gap solar cells" | - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 45, no. 3, August 1984, New York, US, pp. 294-296; E.E. MENDEZ et al.: "Temperature dependence of the electron mobility in GaAs-GaA1As heterostructures" |