EP0607278 - METHOD FOR ENHANCING GUT ABSORPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BRIGHAM AND WOMEN'S HOSPITAL, INC. 75 Francis Street Boston, MA 02115 / US | [2001/14] |
Former [1994/30] | For all designated states BRIGHAM AND WOMEN'S HOSPITAL 75 Francis Street Boston, Massachusetts 02115 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILMORE, Douglas 125 Rockwood Street Brookline, MA 02146 / US | [1994/30] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [1994/30] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 92921577.0 | 07.10.1992 | [1994/30] | WO1992US08445 | Priority number, date | US19910771415 | 07.10.1991 Original published format: US 771415 | [1994/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9306839 | Date: | 15.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0607278 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0607278 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.04.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, A61K31/195 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
A61K38/27 (EP,US);
A61K38/30 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/27, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/27, A61K31/195 (EP,US);
A61K38/30, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/30, A61K31/195 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [1995/05] | A61K37/00, A61K31/195, A61K37/02, // (A61K37/02, 31:195) | ||
Former IPC [1994/30] | A61K37/00, A61K31/195 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER DARMABSORPTION | [1994/30] | English: | METHOD FOR ENHANCING GUT ABSORPTION | [1994/30] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'AMELIORER L'ABSORPTION INTESTINALE | [1994/30] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.1994 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.1994 | Search fee paid | 24.03.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 07.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/30] | 12.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9002560 (PITMAN MOORE INC [US]) [Y] 1-14* claim - *; | [PX]WO9203155 (KABI PHARMACIA AB [SE]) [PX] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4857555 (SMITH ROBERT J [US], et al); | [Y]US4863901 (WILMORE DOUGLAS W [US]) | [Y] - The Merck Index, 11th edition (1989), see citations 8670 and 8672 at pages 1373 and 1374. |