EP0660786 - A METHOD OF CLEANSING WOODWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.11.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DE | published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHIRNIG, Ulrich Herbert Gl. Mont 35 DK-1117 Copenhagen K / DK | [1995/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/27] | Representative(s) | Noergaard, Tage, et al Chas. Hude A/S H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 1780 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | Noergaard, Tage, et al Chas. Hude H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 DK-1553 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 92921598.6 | 15.09.1992 | [1995/27] | WO1992DK00278 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9406638 | Date: | 31.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0660786 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0660786 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 31.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B44D3/16, C09D9/00, B27K3/02 | [1995/27] | CPC: |
B27K5/0085 (EP);
B27K3/38 (EP);
C09D9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1995/27] | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSMETHODE FÜR HOLZWERK | [1995/27] | English: | A METHOD OF CLEANSING WOODWORK | [1995/27] | French: | PROCEDE DE NETTOYAGE DU BOIS | [1995/27] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.1995 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/27] | 11.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.10.1997
11.12.1998
INADMISSIBLE Holm Nielsen & Son A/S Sydhavnsvei 3 3700 Ronne / DK | [1999/05] |
Former [1997/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.10.1997
INADMISSIBLE Holm Nielsen & Son A/S Sydhavnsvei 3 3700 Ronne / DK | 29.10.1997 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.01.1997 | CH | 15.01.1997 | LI | 15.01.1997 | NL | 15.01.1997 | GB | 15.09.1997 | FR | 31.05.2002 | SE | 16.09.2002 | DE | 01.04.2003 | [2004/02] |
Former [2003/32] | AT | 15.01.1997 | |
CH | 15.01.1997 | ||
LI | 15.01.1997 | ||
NL | 15.01.1997 | ||
GB | 15.09.1997 | ||
FR | 31.05.2002 | ||
SE | 16.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/27] | AT | 15.01.1997 | |
CH | 15.01.1997 | ||
LI | 15.01.1997 | ||
NL | 15.01.1997 | ||
GB | 15.09.1997 | ||
SE | 16.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 15.01.1997 | |
CH | 15.01.1997 | ||
LI | 15.01.1997 | ||
NL | 15.01.1997 | ||
GB | 15.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/41] | AT | 15.01.1997 | |
CH | 15.01.1997 | ||
LI | 15.01.1997 | ||
GB | 15.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 15.01.1997 | |
CH | 15.01.1997 | ||
LI | 15.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 15.01.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR397786 ; | [A]SE465760 ; | [T]WO9219429 ; | [T]DK48291 |