EP0607338 - AN APPARATUS FOR APPLYING LABELS TO OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.1997 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRYGG, Lars, Erik Box 243 S-374 24 Karlshamn / SE | [1994/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/30] | Representative(s) | Axelsson, Rolf, et al Kransell & Wennborg KB Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | Axelsson, Rolf, et al Kransell & Wennborg AB Box 27834 S-115 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 92922339.4 | 13.10.1992 | [1994/30] | WO1992SE00718 | Priority number, date | SE19910003026 | 17.10.1991 Original published format: SE 9103026 | [1994/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9308082 | Date: | 29.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0607338 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0607338 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 29.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65C9/22 | [1994/30] | CPC: |
B65C9/16 (EP,US);
B65C9/2269 (EP,US);
B65C9/2291 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1768 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL [1994/30] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ETIKETTIEREN VON GEGENSTÄNDEN | [1994/30] | English: | AN APPARATUS FOR APPLYING LABELS TO OBJECTS | [1994/30] | French: | APPAREIL POUR APPLIQUER DES ETIQUETTES SUR DES OBJETS | [1994/30] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.1994 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 29.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/30] | 21.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 14.08.1996 | DK | 14.08.1996 | GR | 14.08.1996 | LI | 14.08.1996 | NL | 14.08.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [2000/52] | CH | 14.08.1996 | |
DK | 14.08.1996 | ||
GR | 14.08.1996 | ||
LI | 14.08.1996 | ||
Former [2000/50] | DK | 14.08.1996 | |
GR | 14.08.1996 | ||
CH | 19.11.1996 | ||
LI | 19.11.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | DK | 14.08.1996 | |
GR | 14.08.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 14.08.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2616916 ; | [A]DE3131164 (JAGENBERG WERKE AG [DE]) |