EP0606399 - DEVICE FOR PARTIALLY CURLING HAIR NEAR THE ROOTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.1996 [1996/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUENIN, Dominique 11, rue Macarani F-06000 Nice / FR | [1994/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/29] | Representative(s) | Hautier, Jean-Louis Cabinet Hautier Office Méditerranéen de Brevets d'Invention 20, rue de la Liberté 06000 Nice / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/29] | Hautier, Jean-Louis Cabinet Hautier Office Méditerranéen de Brevets d'Invention et de Marques 24 rue Masséna F-06000 Nice / FR | Application number, filing date | 92922514.2 | 28.09.1992 | [1994/29] | WO1992FR00900 | Priority number, date | FR19910012333 | 02.10.1991 Original published format: FR 9112333 | FR19920003565 | 19.03.1992 Original published format: FR 9203565 | [1994/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9306760 | Date: | 15.04.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0606399 | Date: | 20.07.1994 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A45D2/00 | [1994/29] | CPC: |
A45D2/00 (EP);
A45D2/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/29] | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUM WELLEN DER HAARE IN DER NÄHE DER WURZELN | [1994/29] | English: | DEVICE FOR PARTIALLY CURLING HAIR NEAR THE ROOTS | [1994/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR FRISER PARTIELLEMENT LES CHEVEUX AU VOISINAGE DE LA RACINE | [1994/29] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.1994 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/29] | 19.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/22] | 05.01.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1995 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4327754 ; | [A]US4644965 ; | [A]FR615856 ; | [A]DE815378 ; | [A]US2281853 ; | [A]US2490124 |