EP0611368 - SUBSTITUTED AMINOPYRIMIDINES AS ANGIOTENSIN II ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/34] | SUBSTITUTED AMINOPYRIMIDINES AS ANGIOTENSINE II ANTAGONISTS | ||
[1996/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.1996 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.02.1997 [1997/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states American Home Products Corporation Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/34] | For all designated states AMERICAN HOME PRODUCTS CORPORATION Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SARANTAKIS, Dimitrios 262 Sentinel Avenue Newtown, PA 18940 / US | 02 /
BICKSLER, James, Jacob Princeton Arms North I, Apt. 38 Cranbury, NJ 08619 / US | 03 /
ELLINGBOE, John, Watson 35 Chestnut Street Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | 04 /
ANTANE, Madelene 14214 Marie Court Lawrenceville, NJ 08536 / US | [1996/06] |
Former [1994/34] | 01 /
SARANTAKIS, Dimitrios 262 Sentinel Avenue Newtown, PA 18940 / US | ||
02 /
BICKSLER, James, Jacob Princeton Arms North I, Apt. 38 Cranbury, NJ 08619 / US | |||
03 /
ELLINGBOE, John, Watson 35 Chestnut Street Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | |||
04 /
NIKAIDO, Madelene 32-12 Fox Run Drive Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | Representative(s) | Connelly, Michael John, et al C/o Patent Department Wyeth Laboratories Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/06] | Connelly, Michael John, et al c/o Patent Department Wyeth Laboratories Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | ||
Former [1994/34] | Connelly, Michael John c/o Patent Department Wyeth Laboratories Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 92922669.4 | 22.10.1992 | [1994/34] | WO1992US09064 | Priority number, date | US19910782026 | 24.10.1991 Original published format: US 782026 | US19920900639 | 18.06.1992 Original published format: US 900639 | [1994/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9308169 | Date: | 29.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0611368 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0611368 | Date: | 07.02.1996 | [1996/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/42, C07D401/12, C07D403/12, A61K31/505 | [1994/34] | CPC: |
C07D239/42 (EP,US);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/34] | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE AMINOPYRIMIDINE ALS ANGIOTENSIN II ANTAGONISTEN | [1994/34] | English: | SUBSTITUTED AMINOPYRIMIDINES AS ANGIOTENSIN II ANTAGONISTS | [1996/06] | French: | AMINOPYRIMIDINES SUBSTITUEES UTILISEES COMME ANTAGONISTES DE L'ANGIOTENSINE II | [1994/34] |
Former [1994/34] | SUBSTITUTED AMINOPYRIMIDINES AS ANGIOTENSINE II ANTAGONISTS | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.1994 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/34] | 14.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0435827 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [XP]EP0475206 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) |