EP0612436 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING TRANSFORMER WINDINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASTA Elektrodraht GmbH Oed 1 A-2755 Oed/Bez. Wiener Neustadt / AT | [1995/50] |
Former [1994/35] | For all designated states ASTA GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H. A-2755 Oed/ Bezirk Wiener Neustadt / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JÄGERSBERGER, Kurt Karlgasse 212 A-2763 Pernitz / AT | [1994/35] | Representative(s) | Krause, Peter Sagerbachgasse 7 2500 Baden / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Krause, Peter Penzinger Strasse 76 A-1141 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 92923177.7 | 09.11.1992 | [1994/35] | WO1992AT00143 | Priority number, date | AT19910002275 | 15.11.1991 Original published format: AT 227591 | [1994/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9310543 | Date: | 27.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0612436 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0612436 | Date: | 09.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01F41/04, H01B13/02 | [1994/35] | CPC: |
H01F41/07 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49071 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER WICKLUNG FÜR TRANSFORMATOREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [1994/35] | English: | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING TRANSFORMER WINDINGS | [1994/35] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN ENROULEMENT POUR TRANSFORMATEUR ET INSTALLATION POUR L'EXECUTION DU PROCEDE | [1994/35] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.1994 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/35] | 27.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 09.08.1995 | FR | 09.08.1995 | GB | 09.08.1995 | NL | 09.08.1995 | SE | 09.11.1995 | CH | 30.11.1995 | LI | 30.11.1995 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | ES | 09.08.1995 | |
FR | 09.08.1995 | ||
GB | 09.08.1995 | ||
SE | 09.11.1995 | ||
CH | 30.11.1995 | ||
LI | 30.11.1995 | ||
Former [1997/28] | GB | 09.08.1995 | |
SE | 09.11.1995 | ||
CH | 30.11.1995 | ||
LI | 30.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/30] | GB | 09.08.1995 | |
SE | 09.11.1995 | ||
Former [1996/14] | SE | 09.11.1995 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2013949 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [Y]US3747205 (MOORE H); | [A]EP0105426 (STICHT FERTIGUNGSTECH STIWA [AT]); | [Y]EP0408832 (LACKDRAHT UNION GMBH [DE]) |