EP0575570 - WRISTWATCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.1998 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1999 [1999/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAGMANN, Eberhard Hindenburgstrasse 21 D-75248 Ölbronn-Dürrn 1 / DE | [1993/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/52] | Representative(s) | Twelmeier, Ulrich, et al Zerrennerstrasse 23-25 75172 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/52] | Twelmeier, Ulrich, Dipl.Phys., et al Westliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 29-31 D-75172 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 92923754.3 | 19.11.1992 | [1993/52] | WO1992EP02668 | Priority number, date | DE19910014446U | 20.11.1991 Original published format: DE 9114446 U | DE19920003248U | 11.03.1992 Original published format: DE 9203248 U | [1993/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9310486 | Date: | 27.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0575570 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0575570 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G04B37/14 | [1993/52] | CPC: |
G04B37/1493 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1994/17] |
Former [1993/52] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE | Title | German: | ARMBANDUHR | [1993/52] | English: | WRISTWATCH | [1993/52] | French: | MONTRE-BRACELET | [1993/52] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.1993 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.1993 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, DK, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, SE | 02.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/05] | 14.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 26.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.09.1993 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.1993 | 28.09.1993 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1993 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.1993 | 28.09.1993 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.1993 | 28.09.1993 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1993 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.1993 | 28.09.1993 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.1993 | 28.09.1993 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.1993 | 28.09.1993 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1993 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1993 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.1993 | 28.09.1993 | LI   M01   Fee paid on   26.10.1993 | 28.09.1993 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1993 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1993 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1993 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.02.1995 | 30.11.1996 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   01.02.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]CH664663 ; | [A]IT456923 ; | [X]US1702895 (JULIUS DINHOFER); | [X]FR697795 ; | [X]FR1231299 ; | [A]US2990678 (JACQUES COMTE); | [X]CH614589G ; | [X]EP0164166 (GAY FRERES SA [CH]); | [X]CH657245G ; | [X]CH662028G |