EP0571574 - CIRCUIT CONTAINING SYMMETRICALLY-DRIVEN COIL FOR ENERGIZING ELECTRODELESS LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.1999 [1999/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLOWIL INTERNATIONAL LIGHTING (HOLDING) B.V. "Atrium" Building 2nd Floor, Strawinskylaan 3037 1077 ZX Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/48] | For all designated states FLOWIL INTERNATIONAL LIGHTING (HOLDING) B.V. "Atrium" Building 2nd Floor, Strawinskylaan 3037 NL-1077 ZX Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEYNBERG, Iosif 300 Lynn Shore Drive Lynn, MA 01902 / US | 02 /
WHITNEY, Fred 4 Andrew Street Salem, MA 01970 / US | [1993/48] | Representative(s) | Butler, Michael John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/48] | Butler, Michael John FRANK B. DEHN & CO. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London, WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92924436.6 | 13.11.1992 | [1993/48] | WO1992US09799 | Priority number, date | US19910792120 | 14.11.1991 Original published format: US 792120 | [1993/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9310649 | Date: | 27.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0571574 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0571574 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/29 | [1993/48] | CPC: |
H05B41/2806 (EP,US);
Y02B20/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/48] | Title | German: | SCHALTUNG MIT EINER SPULE MIT SYMETRISCHER ANZAPFUNG ZUR SPEISUNG ELEKTRODENLOSER LAMPE | [1998/10] | English: | CIRCUIT CONTAINING SYMMETRICALLY-DRIVEN COIL FOR ENERGIZING ELECTRODELESS LAMP | [1993/48] | French: | CIRCUIT CONTENANT UNE BOBINE D'INDUCTION EXCITEE SYMETRIQUEMENT POUR LA MISE SOUS TENSION D'UNE LAMPE A DECHARGE SANS ELECTRODES | [1993/48] |
Former [1993/48] | SCHALTUNG MIT EINER SPULE MIT SYMETRISCHER ANZAPFUNG ZUR SPEISUNG ELEKTRODENLOSE LAMPEN | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.1993 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/48] | 20.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/08] | Request for further processing for: | 11.04.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 11.04.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.04.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2163014 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [AP]EP0458546 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]US5027041 (GODYAK VALERY [US], et al) |