EP0618990 - DEVICE FOR COVERING A WALL APERTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1998 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DRUMBL, Otto Bockkellerstrasse 8 A-1190 Wien / AT | [1994/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/41] | Representative(s) | Brauneiss, Leo Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Leo Brauneiss Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Helmut Wildhack Dipl.-Ing Gerhard Jellinek Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50 Postfach 281 1031 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/41] | Brauneiss, Leo, Dipl.Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Leo Brauneiss Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Helmut Wildhack Dipl.-Ing Gerhard Jellinek Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50 Postfach 281 A-1031 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 92924486.1 | 17.12.1992 | [1994/41] | WO1992AT00170 | Priority number, date | AT19910002530 | 19.12.1991 Original published format: AT 253091 | [1994/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9312310 | Date: | 24.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0618990 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0618990 | Date: | 05.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | E04F19/08, A47K3/16, H01F7/02 | [1994/41] | CPC: |
E04F19/08 (EP,US);
Y10S52/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, PT [1994/41] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ABDECKUNG EINER MAUERÖFFNUNG | [1994/41] | English: | DEVICE FOR COVERING A WALL APERTURE | [1994/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LE RECOUVREMENT D'UNE OUVERTURE DANS UN MUR | [1994/41] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.1994 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/41] | 02.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3544846 (ROTH ECKART [DE]); | [A]EP0397585 (TAVOSCHI FULVIO [FR]); | [A]DE3544847 (ROTH ECKART [DE]) |