EP0616606 - DENSE CERAMIC PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Limestone Avenue Campbell, ACT 2612 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Limestone Avenue Campbell, ACT 2601 / AU | ||
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Limestone Avenue Campbell, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | ||
Former [1994/39] | For all designated states COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION Limestone Avenue Campbell, Australian Capital Territory 2601 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRIGG, Mark, Brian 34 Highgate Grove Ashburton, VIC 3147 / AU | 02 /
OH, Chull, Hee 9 Lindfield Court Knoxfield, VIC 3180 / AU | [1994/39] | Representative(s) | Orès, Bernard, et al Cabinet ORES 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/39] | Orès, Bernard, et al Cabinet ORES 6, Avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 92924510.8 | 11.12.1992 | [1994/39] | WO1992AU00661 | Priority number, date | AU19910000017 | 13.12.1991 Original published format: AU 1791 | [1994/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9312051 | Date: | 24.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0616606 | Date: | 28.09.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0616606 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 24.06.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/565, C04B35/653, C04B35/64 | [1999/03] | CPC: |
C04B35/64 (EP,US);
C04B35/56 (KR);
C04B35/565 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/39] | C04B35/56, C04B35/60, C04B35/64 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/39] | Title | German: | DICHTE KERAMISCHE PRODUKTE | [1994/39] | English: | DENSE CERAMIC PRODUCT | [1994/39] | French: | PRODUIT CERAMIQUE DENSE | [1994/39] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.1994 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.1994 | Search fee paid | 07.06.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 13.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/39] | 07.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.06.1999 | BE | 02.06.1999 | CH | 02.06.1999 | ES | 02.06.1999 | GR | 02.06.1999 | IT | 02.06.1999 | LI | 02.06.1999 | NL | 02.06.1999 | SE | 02.06.1999 | DK | 02.09.1999 | PT | 02.09.1999 | IE | 11.12.1999 | LU | 11.12.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
BE | 02.06.1999 | ||
CH | 02.06.1999 | ||
ES | 02.06.1999 | ||
GR | 02.06.1999 | ||
LI | 02.06.1999 | ||
NL | 02.06.1999 | ||
SE | 02.06.1999 | ||
DK | 02.09.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
IE | 11.12.1999 | ||
LU | 11.12.1999 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
BE | 02.06.1999 | ||
CH | 02.06.1999 | ||
ES | 02.06.1999 | ||
GR | 02.06.1999 | ||
LI | 02.06.1999 | ||
NL | 02.06.1999 | ||
SE | 02.06.1999 | ||
DK | 02.09.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
IE | 11.12.1999 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
BE | 02.06.1999 | ||
CH | 02.06.1999 | ||
ES | 02.06.1999 | ||
GR | 02.06.1999 | ||
LI | 02.06.1999 | ||
NL | 02.06.1999 | ||
SE | 02.06.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
IE | 11.12.1999 | ||
MC | 31.12.1999 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
BE | 02.06.1999 | ||
CH | 02.06.1999 | ||
ES | 02.06.1999 | ||
GR | 02.06.1999 | ||
LI | 02.06.1999 | ||
NL | 02.06.1999 | ||
SE | 02.06.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
IE | 11.12.1999 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
BE | 02.06.1999 | ||
CH | 02.06.1999 | ||
ES | 02.06.1999 | ||
GR | 02.06.1999 | ||
LI | 02.06.1999 | ||
SE | 02.06.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
IE | 11.12.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
BE | 02.06.1999 | ||
CH | 02.06.1999 | ||
GR | 02.06.1999 | ||
LI | 02.06.1999 | ||
SE | 02.06.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
IE | 11.12.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
BE | 02.06.1999 | ||
CH | 02.06.1999 | ||
GR | 02.06.1999 | ||
LI | 02.06.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
IE | 11.12.1999 | ||
Former [2001/12] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
BE | 02.06.1999 | ||
CH | 02.06.1999 | ||
LI | 02.06.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
IE | 11.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
BE | 02.06.1999 | ||
CH | 02.06.1999 | ||
LI | 02.06.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
BE | 02.06.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
CH | 07.09.1999 | ||
LI | 07.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/25] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
BE | 02.06.1999 | ||
PT | 02.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 02.06.1999 | |
BE | 02.06.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | BE | 02.06.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]JP61117159 ; | [X]JP01076967 ; | [X]JP63282161 ; | [X]US4564490 (OMORI MAMORU [JP], et al); | [X]US4569921 (OMORI MAMORU [JP], et al); | [X]GB2170516 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [A]US4829027 (CUTLER RAYMOND A [US], et al); | [A]CA1256459 (KEMPTEN ELEKTROSCHMELZ GMBH); | [X]AU6309590 (CARBORUNDUM CO); | [X]AU6620690 (WESTERN MINING CORP) | [X] - DERWENT ABSTRACT, Accession No. 86-185381/29, Class L02; & JP,A,61 117 159 (HITACHI KK) 4 June 1986 (04.06.86), Abstract., & JP61117159 A 19860604 | [X] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, C-612, page 63; & JP,A,01 076 967 (MAMORU OMORI) 23 March 1989 (23.03.89), Abstract., & JP01076967 A 19890323 | [X] - DERWENT ABSTRACT, Accession No. 89-003885/01, Class L02; & JP,A,63 282 161 (JGC CORP) 18 November 1988 (18.11.88), Abstract., & JP63282161 A 19881118 | [A] - Journal of the American Ceramic Society, Volume 71, No. 1, issued January 1988, TOSIKAZU SAKAI, "Phase Transformation and Thermal Conductivity of Hot-Pressed Silicon Carbide Containing Alumina and Carbon", pages C-7 to C-9, whole document. |