EP0616562 - SOLDER PASTE FORMULATIONS FOR USE IN THE ELECTRONICS INDUSTRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2000 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.2000 [2000/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COOKSON GROUP plc The Adelphi, 1-11 John Adam Street London WC2N 6HJ / GB | [1999/34] |
Former [1994/39] | For all designated states COOKSON GROUP plc 130 Wood Street London EC2V 6EQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATERSON, Geoffrey Andrew 3 Hertford Court, Kidlingdon Oxford OX5 2JZ / GB | 02 /
KING, Charles Edmund 39 Hazel Crescent Kidlingdon, Oxford OX5 1EH / GB | 03 /
MACKIE, Andrew Christopher 19A Neville Road, Heacham King's Lynn, Norfolk PE31 7HA / GB | [1994/39] | Representative(s) | Allard, Susan Joyce BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/39] | Allard, Susan Joyce BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92924767.4 | 30.11.1992 | [1994/39] | WO1992GB02214 | Priority number, date | GB19910026498 | 13.12.1991 Original published format: GB 9126498 | [1994/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9311905 | Date: | 24.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0616562 | Date: | 28.09.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0616562 | Date: | 22.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B23K35/36, B23K35/22 | [1994/39] | CPC: |
B23K35/3612 (EP);
B23K35/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/39] | Title | German: | WEICHLOTPASTENZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER ELEKTONIKINDUSTRIE | [1994/39] | English: | SOLDER PASTE FORMULATIONS FOR USE IN THE ELECTRONICS INDUSTRY | [1994/39] | French: | FORMULATIONS DE PATE A BRASER DESTINEES A L'INDUSTRIE ELECTRONIQUE | [1994/39] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.1994 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 23.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/39] | 02.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4342607 ; | [X]EP0140344 ; | [A]GB1521132 ; | [A]GB2198676 ; | [A]EP0413540 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 115, no. 26 Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 285256r, |