EP0616640 - PRODUCTION OF ANTI-SELF ANTIBODIES FROM ANTIBODY SEGMENT REPERTOIRES AND DISPLAYED ON PHAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDICAL RESEARCH COUNCIL 20 Park Crescent London W1N 4AL / GB | For all designated states CAMBRIDGE ANTIBODY TECHNOLOGY LIMITED Milstein Building Granta Park Cambridge CB4 6GH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/28] | For all designated states MEDICAL RESEARCH COUNCIL 20 Park Crescent London W1N 4AL / GB | ||
For all designated states Cambridge Antibody Technology Limited Milstein Building Granta Park Cambridge CB4 6GH / GB | |||
Former [1994/39] | For all designated states MEDICAL RESEARCH COUNCIL 20 Park Crescent London W1N 4AL / GB | ||
For all designated states CAMBRIDGE ANTIBODY TECHNOLOGY LIMITED The Science Park Melbourn, Cambridgeshire SG8 6EJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIFFITHS, Andrew, David 28 Lilac Court Cherry Hinton Road Cambridge CB1 4AY / GB | 02 /
HOOGENBOOM, Hendricus, Renerus, Jacobus, Mattheus 1 Hauxton Road Little Shelford Cambridge CB2 5JH / GB | 03 /
MARKS, James, David 971 Page Street San Francisco, CA 94117 / US | 04 /
McCAFFERTY, John 32 Wakelin Avenue Sawston Cambridgeshire CB2 4DA / GB | 05 /
WINTER, Gregory, Paul 64 Cavendish Avenue Cambridge CB1 4UT / GB | 06 /
GRIGG, Geoffrey, Walter 352 Burns Bay Road Lane Cove Linley Point, NSW 2066 / AU | [1994/39] | Representative(s) | Armitage, Ian Michael, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/39] | Armitage, Ian Michael, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 92924775.7 | 02.12.1992 | [1994/39] | WO1992GB02240 | Priority number, date | GB19910025579 | 02.12.1991 Original published format: GB 9125579 | GB19910025582 | 02.12.1991 Original published format: GB 9125582 | GB19920006318 | 24.03.1992 Original published format: GB 9206318 | GB19920006372 | 24.03.1992 Original published format: GB 9206372 | WO1992GB01755 | 23.09.1992 Original published format: PCT/GB92/01755 | [1994/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9311236 | Date: | 10.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0616640 | Date: | 28.09.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0616640 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/13, C12N15/62, C07K14/00, C12P21/08, G01N33/531, G01N33/68 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
C07K16/005 (EP);
C07K16/18 (EP);
C07K16/241 (EP);
C07K16/26 (EP);
C07K16/28 (EP);
C07K16/2812 (EP);
C07K16/2863 (EP);
C07K16/2866 (EP);
C07K16/3007 (EP);
C07K16/3092 (EP);
C07K16/34 (EP);
C07K16/4241 (EP);
B01J2219/00718 (EP);
C07K2317/24 (EP);
C07K2317/55 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1994/39] | C12N15/13, C12N15/62, C07K13/00, C12P21/08, G01N33/531, G01N33/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/39] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Antikörpern auf Phagenoberflächen ausgehend von Antikörpersegmentbibliotheken. | [1994/39] | English: | PRODUCTION OF ANTI-SELF ANTIBODIES FROM ANTIBODY SEGMENT REPERTOIRES AND DISPLAYED ON PHAGE | [1994/39] | French: | PRODUCTION D'ANTICORPS ANTI-AUTO-ANTIGENES A PARTIR DE REPERTOIRES DE SEGMENTS D'ANTICORPS AFFICHES SUR PHAGE | [1994/39] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.1994 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 21.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/47] | 11.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 21.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 19.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00107845.0 / EP1024191 | EP06001908.0 / EP1696031 | EP10002988.3 / EP2224006 | Opposition(s) | 02.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/34] | Request for further processing for: | 02.05.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 02.05.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.05.2002 | Decision despatched | 10.04.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 10.04.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.04.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.08.1994 | M01   Fee paid on   25.08.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 01.12.2004 | LU | 02.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | PT | 01.02.2005 | [2008/05] |
Former [2007/16] | GR | 01.12.2004 | |
LU | 02.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | GR | 01.12.2004 | |
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | GR | 01.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO8806630 (GENEX CORP [US]); | [X]WO9014443 (HUSE WILLIAM D [US]); | [X]WO9014430 (SCRIPPS CLINIC RES [US], et al); | [X]WO9014424 (SCRIPPS CLINIC RES [US]); | [XP]WO9201047 (CAMBRIDGE ANTIBODY TECH [GB], et al); | [XP]WO9220791 (CMABRIDGE ANTIBODY TECH [GB], et al) | [X] - SCIENCE vol. 246, 8 December 1989, LANCASTER, PA pages 1275 - 1281 Huse, W.D. et al.; 'Generation of a large combinatorial library of the Immunoglobulin repertoire in Phage lambda.' | [X] - NATURE. vol. 349, 24 January 1991, LONDON GB pages 293 - 299 Winter, Greg; Milstein, Cesar; 'Man-made antibodies' cited in the application | [X] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA. vol. 88, May 1991, WASHINGTON US pages 4363 - 4366 Kang, A.S. et al.; 'Linkage of recognition and replication functions by assembling combinatorial antibody Fab libraries along phage surface.' | [XP] - BIOTECHNOLOGY vol. 10, no. 7, July 1992, NEW YORK US pages 779 - 783 Marks, James D.; Griffiths, Andrew D.; Malmqvist, Magnus; Clackson, Tim P.; Bye, Jacqueline M.; Winter, Greg; 'By-passing immunization: building high affinity human antibodies by chain shuffling' | Examination | EP0368684 | - PORTOLANO S. ET AL, "A human Fab Fragment Specific for Thyroid peroxidase generated by cloning thyroid lymphocyte-derived immunoglobulin genes in a bacteriophage lambda library", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (19910830), vol. 179, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/0006-291X(91)91380-U, pages 372 - 377, XP024836340 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-291X(91)91380-U | - GARRARD L.J. ET AL, "Fab assembly and enrichment in a monovalent phage display system", BIOTECHNOLOGY, (199112), vol. 9, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt1291-1373, pages 1373 - 1377, XP001084206 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1291-1373 |