EP0571595 - TITANIUM CONTAINING MAGNESIUM ALLOY PRODUCED BY VAPOUR QUENCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.02.1997 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 26.03.1997 [1997/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SECRETARY OF STATE FOR DEFENCE IN HER BRITANNIC MAJESTY'S GOV. OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND RAE Whitehall London SW1A 2HB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/48] | For all designated states THE SECRETARY OF STATE FOR DEFENCE IN HER BRITANNIC MAJESTY'S GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND, RAE Farnborough Hampshire GU14 6TD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAY, David John 125D Prospect Road Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 84A / GB | 02 /
GARDINER, Robert William 32 The Crescent, Heath End, Farnham Surrey, Hampshire GU9 0LG / GB | 03 /
VINEY, Brian William 7 St. Michaels Road Farnborouugh, Hampshire GU14 8ND / GB | [1993/48] | Representative(s) | Beckham, Robert William, et al D/IPR (DERA) Formalities Poplar 2 MoD Abbey Wood 19 Bristol BS34 8JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/48] | Beckham, Robert William, et al Defence Research Agency Intellectual Property Department DRA Farnborough R69 Building Farnborough, Hants. GU14 6TD / GB | Application number, filing date | 92924804.5 | 09.12.1992 | [1993/48] | WO1992GB02279 | Priority number, date | GB19910026619 | 16.12.1991 Original published format: GB 9126619 | [1993/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9312262 | Date: | 24.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0571595 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C22C1/00, C22C23/00, C23C14/14 | [1993/48] | CPC: |
C23C14/24 (EP);
C22C23/00 (EP);
C23C14/14 (EP);
C23C14/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/48] | Title | German: | DURCH AUFDAMPFEN HERGESTELLTE TITANHALTIGE MAGNESIUMLEGIERUNGEN | [1993/48] | English: | TITANIUM CONTAINING MAGNESIUM ALLOY PRODUCED BY VAPOUR QUENCHING | [1993/48] | French: | ALLIAGE DE MAGNESIUM CONTENANT DU TITANE OBTENU PAR REFROIDISSEMENT BRUSQUE DE VAPEUR | [1993/48] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.1993 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/48] | 09.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/13] | 01.11.1996 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5024813 ; | [Y]WO9012485 ; | [Y]US2340795 ; | [YP]WO9214852 ; | [A]GB1382970 ; | [A]US2178582 ; | [A]US4264362 | [Y] - MATERIALS LETTERS, Volume 11, No. 8-9, July 1991, Ward-Close, C.M., et al, "The Production of Titanium-Magnesium Alloys by Vapour Quenching." |