EP0611354 - CORRUGATED PALLET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.11.2012 [2012/46] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
CH
LI
DE
DK
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
SE
UNIPAL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION 2646 Lasso Lane Lakeland, FL 33801 / US | For:ES
Cartonajes Santorroman, S.A. Ctra. Zaragoza 32 26600 Calahorra / ES | [1998/18] |
Former [1997/46] | For all designated states UNIPAL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION 2646 Lasso Lane Lakeland, FL 33801 / US | ||
Former [1994/34] | For all designated states CORRUGATED PALLET CORPORATION 2646 Lasso Lane Lakeland, FL 33801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WINEBARGER, Ken, N. 2007 Woodbriar Loop, South Lakeland, FL 33813 / US | 02 /
LEE, Stanley, M. 12510 Exbury Court Tomball, TX 77375 / US | [1994/34] | Representative(s) | Hano, Christian, et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/34] | Hano, Christian, et al von Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck, Patentanwälte, Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92925297.1 | 12.11.1992 | [1994/34] | WO1992US09928 | Priority number, date | US19910792182 | 14.11.1991 Original published format: US 792182 | [1994/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9310011 | Date: | 27.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0611354 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0611354 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.05.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B65D19/00, B65D19/34 | [1996/21] | CPC: |
B65D19/0026 (EP,US);
B65D19/0024 (EP,US);
B65D19/0028 (EP,US);
B65D19/20 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00019 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00054 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00124 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00273 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00288 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00293 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00298 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00323 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00333 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00338 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00348 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00402 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00432 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00557 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1994/34] | B65D19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/34] | Title | German: | WELLPAPPE-PALETTE | [1994/34] | English: | CORRUGATED PALLET | [1994/34] | French: | PALETTE EN MATERIAU ONDULE | [1994/34] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.1994 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.1994 | Search fee paid | 14.06.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/34] | 13.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 14.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/01] | Request for further processing for: | 16.04.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 16.04.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.05.1998 | Decision despatched | 16.04.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 16.04.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 14.05.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.01.1999 | CH | 13.01.1999 | GR | 13.01.1999 | LI | 13.01.1999 | SE | 13.01.1999 | DK | 13.04.1999 | [2012/46] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 13.01.1999 | |
CH | 13.01.1999 | ||
GR | 13.01.1999 | ||
LI | 13.01.1999 | ||
SE | 13.01.1999 | ||
DK | 13.04.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 13.01.1999 | |
CH | 13.01.1999 | ||
GR | 13.01.1999 | ||
LI | 13.01.1999 | ||
SE | 13.01.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 13.01.1999 | |
CH | 13.01.1999 | ||
GR | 13.01.1999 | ||
LI | 13.01.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 13.01.1999 | |
CH | 13.01.1999 | ||
LI | 13.01.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 13.01.1999 | |
CH | 19.04.1999 | ||
LI | 19.04.1999 | ||
Former [2000/21] | AT | 13.01.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4979446 (WINEBARGER KEN N [US]) [X] 1,6,8-16,20-24* column 3, line 29 - column 8, line 22; figures 1-7 * | International search | [A]US2287740 (HENNING KLOUMAN); | [A]US2709559 (WILLIAM GEISLER); | [A]US3026078 (DANIEL SIMKINS); | [A]US3256839 (PETERSON ALAN A, et al); | [Y]US3940101 (HEIDELBACH CHARLES A); | [A]US4077334 (SVIRKLYS FERDINAND M); | [A]US4359948 (JUDY PAUL E, et al); | [Y]US4841880 (FERGUSON STEWART [US]); | [A]US4867074 (QUASNICK ROBERT J [US]) |