EP0619816 - A PROCESS FOR THE RESOLUTION OF (+-)-ALPHA- 2- ÅCETYL(1-METHYLETHYL)AMINO ETHYL -ALPHA-(2-CHLOROPHENYL)-1-PIPERIDINEBUTANAMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/42] | A PROCESS FOR THE RESOLUTION OF (+-)-$g(a)- 2- ACETYL(1-METHYLETHYL)AMINO]ETHYL]-$g(a)-(2-CHLOROPHENYL)-1-PIPERIDINEBUTANAMIDE | ||
[2007/46] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.07.1997 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2007 | Change - German title | published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G.D. Searle & Co. P.O. Box 5110 Chicago IL 60680-5110 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/42] | For all designated states G.D. SEARLE & CO. P.O. Box 5110 Chicago IL 60680-5110 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEDICH, John, Richard 565 B North Fourth Des Plaines, IL 60016 / US | 02 /
PLUME, Gatis 771 Bernard Drive Buffalo Grove, IL 60089 / US | [1994/42] | Representative(s) | Beil, Hans Christoph BEIL, WOLFF & BEIL Rechtsanwälte Postfach 80 01 40 65901 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/42] | Beil, Hans Chr., Dr. BEIL, WOLFF & BEIL, Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 80 01 40 D-65901 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 92925349.0 | 27.11.1992 | [1994/42] | WO1992US10020 | Priority number, date | US19910811182 | 20.12.1991 Original published format: US 811182 | [1994/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9313087 | Date: | 08.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0619816 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07D295/14 | [1994/42] | CPC: |
C07D295/145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ISOMERSPALTUNG VON (+-)-ALPHA- 2- ÅCETYL(1-METHYLETHYL)AMINO ETHYL -ALPHA-(2-CHLOROPHENYL)-1-PIPERIDINBUTANAMID | [2007/46] | English: | A PROCESS FOR THE RESOLUTION OF (+-)-ALPHA- 2- ÅCETYL(1-METHYLETHYL)AMINO ETHYL -ALPHA-(2-CHLOROPHENYL)-1-PIPERIDINEBUTANAMIDE | [2007/46] | French: | PROCEDE DE RESOLUTION DE (+-)-ALPHA- 2- ÅCETYLE(1-METHYLETHYLE)AMINO ETHYLE -ALPHA-(2-CHLOROPHENYL)-1-PIPERIDINEBUTANAMIDE | [2007/46] |
Former [1994/42] | VERFAHREN ZUR ISOMERSPALTUNG VON (+)-ALPHA-(2-(ACETYL(1-METHYLETHYL)AMINO)ETHYL)-ALPHA-(2-CHLOROPHENYL)-1-PIPERIDINBUTANAMID | ||
Former [1994/42] | A PROCESS FOR THE RESOLUTION OF (+-)-$g(a)- 2- ACETYL(1-METHYLETHYL)AMINO]ETHYL]-$g(a)-(2-CHLOROPHENYL)-1-PIPERIDINEBUTANAMIDE | ||
Former [1994/42] | PROCEDE DE RESOLUTION DE (+-)-ALPHA- 2- ACETYLE(1-METHYLETHYLE)AMINO]ETHYLE]-ALPHA-(2-CHLOROPHENYL)-1-PIPERIDINEBUTANAMIDE | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.1994 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/42] | 12.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.03.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/34] | 04.04.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1996 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0170901 (SEARLE & CO [US]) | [A] - THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY vol. 50, no. 8, August 1928, WASHINGTON pages 2264 - 2267 A.W. INGERSAOLL 'A Second Method for the Complete Resolution of Externally Compensated Acids and Bases.' cited in the application |