EP0557687 - Tool for driving pedicel screws [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.1996 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Howmedica GmbH Professor-Küntscher-Str. 1-5 D-24232 Schönkirchen / DE | [1993/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Metz-Stavenhagen, Peter, Dr. med. Schlossstrasse 24 W-3590 Bad Wildungen / DE | [1993/35] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1993/35] | Dipl.-Ing. H. Hauck, Dipl.-Ing. E. Graalfs, Dipl.-Ing. W. Wehnert, Dr.-Ing. W. Döring Postfach 30 24 30 D-20308 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 93100127.5 | 07.01.1993 | [1993/35] | Priority number, date | DE19920002561U | 27.02.1992 Original published format: DE 9202561 U | [1993/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0557687 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0557687 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/56 | [1993/35] | CPC: |
A61B17/7082 (EP);
A61B17/8891 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/35] | Title | German: | Eindrehwerkzeug für Pedicelschrauben | [1995/49] | English: | Tool for driving pedicel screws | [1993/35] | French: | Outil pour serrer des vis pour pédicule vertébral | [1993/35] |
Former [1993/35] | Endrehwerkzeug für Pedicelschrauben | Examination procedure | 31.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/10] | 18.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE156269 ; | [A]GB2118474 (TECHMEDICA INC); | [AD]EP0328883 (HOWMEDICA GMBH [DE]); | [A]FR2638630 (JEANSON JEAN FRANCOIS [FR]) |