EP0553635 - Sealing device of packaging device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.1996 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.1996 [1996/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokyo Automatic Machinery Works Limited 10-7 Iwamotocho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/31] | For all designated states Tokyo Automatic Machinery Works Limited 10-7 Iwamotocho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shigeta, Toshio 1889-90 Sakaine Kashiwa-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | [1993/31] | Representative(s) | Denmark, James Bailey, Walsh & Co. 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD Yorkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/31] | Denmark, James Bailey, Walsh & Co. 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 93100356.0 | 13.01.1993 | [1993/31] | Priority number, date | JP19920013335 | 28.01.1992 Original published format: JP 1333592 | [1993/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0553635 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0553635 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65B51/18, B29C65/00 | [1995/47] | CPC: |
B29C65/18 (EP,US);
B29C65/242 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/43121 (EP,US);
B29C66/8226 (EP,US);
B29C66/8227 (EP,US);
B29C66/83423 (EP,US);
B65B51/18 (EP,US);
B29C66/0242 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/8122 (EP,US);
B29K2023/12 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2001/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/12 (US,EP);
B29C66/8122, B29K2905/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/31] | B65B51/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1993/31] | Title | German: | Siegelvorrichtung einer Verpackungsmaschine | [1993/31] | English: | Sealing device of packaging device | [1993/31] | French: | Appareil de scellage dans une machine d'emballage | [1993/31] | Examination procedure | 10.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/12] | 01.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0351553 (SASIB SPA [IT]); | [A]GB1008336 (AVISUN CORP); | [A]FR1250418 (FORGROVE MACH); | [A]WO9105706 (WRIGLEY W M JUN CO [US]); | [A]US3157975 (ALTMAN JR FRANK) |