EP0554696 - Dye mixtures for the dyeing of textile hydrophobic fiber materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.1996 [1996/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST MITSUBISHI KASEI CO., LTD. 10-33, Akasaka 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/32] | For all designated states HOECHST MITSUBISHI KASEI CO., LTD. 10-33, Akasaka 4-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bühler, Ulrich, Dr. Kastanienweg 8 W-8755 Alzenau / DE | 02 /
Kruse, Hubert Hölderlinstrasse 12 W-6240 Königstein / DE | 03 /
Dietz, Erwin, Dr. St.-Matthäus-Strasse 7 W-6233 Kelkheim 3 / DE | [1993/32] | Representative(s) | Urbach, Hans-Georg, et al CASSELLA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, Patentabteilung, Hanauer Landstrasse 526 60386 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/32] | Urbach, Hans-Georg, Dr., et al CASSELLA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, Patentabteilung, Hanauer Landstrasse 526 D-60386 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 93100631.6 | 16.01.1993 | [1993/32] | Priority number, date | DE19924202911 | 01.02.1992 Original published format: DE 4202911 | [1993/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0554696 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0554696 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/22, C09B57/14, D06P1/16, D06P3/54, C09B67/00, C09B5/00 | [1993/36] | CPC: |
D06P3/54 (EP,US);
C09B5/006 (EP,US);
C09B57/14 (EP,US);
C09B67/0034 (EP,US);
Y10S8/922 (US)
|
Former IPC [1993/32] | C09B67/22, C09B57/14, D06P1/16, D06P3/54 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI [1993/32] | Title | German: | Farbstoffmischungen zum Färben von textilen hydrophoben Fasermaterialien | [1993/32] | English: | Dye mixtures for the dyeing of textile hydrophobic fiber materials | [1993/32] | French: | Mélanges de colorants pour la teinture de matériaux fibreux hydrophobes textiles | [1993/32] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 08.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/49] | 02.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/37] | 15.04.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1266076 (BASF AG); | [X]DE1293939 (HOECHST AG); | [A]FR2367140 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]EP0026463 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]EP0046250 (BAYER AG [DE]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 84, no. 24, 14. Juni 1976, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 166255w, Seite 83 ; |