EP0542720 - Process for shortstopping free radical polymerization and stabilized resin compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Geon Company 6100 Oak Tree Boulevard Cleveland Ohio 44131 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/38] | For all designated states The Geon Company 6100 Oak Tree Boulevard Cleveland, Ohio 44131 / US | ||
Former [1993/20] | For all designated states The B.F. Goodrich Company 500 South Main Street Akron Ohio 44318 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sharaby, Zaev 3391 Altamont Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44118 / US | 02 /
Vyvoda, Josef Cyril 287 Greenbriar Drive Avon Lake, Ohio 44012 / US | [1993/20] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1993/20] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 93100846.0 | 25.04.1986 | [1993/20] | Priority number, date | US19850728549 | 29.04.1985 Original published format: US 728549 | US19850728548 | 29.04.1985 Original published format: US 728548 | [1993/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0542720 | Date: | 19.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/42 | [1993/20] | CPC: |
C08F14/06 (EP);
C08F2/38 (KR);
C08F2/42 (EP);
C08K5/13 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F14/06, C08F2/38 (EP);
C08K5/13, C08L27/06 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Abbruch einer radikalischen Polymerisation und stabilisierte Harzzusammensetzungen | [1993/20] | English: | Process for shortstopping free radical polymerization and stabilized resin compositions | [1993/20] | French: | Procédé pour arrêter une polymérisation radicalaire et compositions stabilisés de résines | [1993/20] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 21.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/20] | 01.09.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/43] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP86105784.2 / EP0200181 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2662867 (BRUCE HOERTZ JOSEPH) |