EP0583537 - Punching Tool Selection and Orienting Arrangement for a Punch Press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/08] | Arrangement enabling variably oriented punching with each tool in a multiple tool holder | ||
[1996/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA MACHINERY LTD. 3 Minami Oichiai-cho Kishoin, Minami-ku Kyoto City / JP | [1994/16] |
Former [1994/08] | For all designated states MURATA MACHINERY LTD. 3 Minami Ochiai-cho, Kishoin, Minami-ku Kyoto City / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chun, Victor L. 118 Joanne Road Holland, Pennsylvania 18966 / US | 02 /
Hunter, James R. 6 Concord Way Chadds Ford, Pennsylvania 19317 / US | [1994/08] | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron, Eckert Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/08] | Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Mauerkircherstrasse 31 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93101087.0 | 25.01.1993 | [1994/08] | Priority number, date | US19920933399 | 20.08.1992 Original published format: US 933399 | [1994/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0583537 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0583537 | Date: | 23.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B21D28/12, B21D37/04 | [1994/08] | CPC: |
B26F1/04 (EP,US);
B21D28/12 (EP,US);
Y10T83/8732 (EP,US);
Y10T83/8828 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1994/17] |
Former [1994/08] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Auswahl und Orientierung eines Stanzwerkzeugs für eine Stanzpresse | [1996/50] | English: | Punching Tool Selection and Orienting Arrangement for a Punch Press | [1996/50] | French: | Dispositif pour la sélection et l'orientation d'un outil de découpage pour une presse de découpage | [1996/50] |
Former [1994/08] | Vorrichtung zur veränderlich gerichteten Stanzung mit jedem Werkzeug eines Mehrfach-Werkzeughalters | ||
Former [1994/08] | Arrangement enabling variably oriented punching with each tool in a multiple tool holder | ||
Former [1994/08] | Dispositif permettant de découper dans diverses directions avec chaque outil d'un porte-outil à plusieurs outils | Examination procedure | 26.02.1993 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, DK, ES, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT | 21.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/25] | 01.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.09.1993 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1993 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1993 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1993 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1993 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1993 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1993 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1993 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1993 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1993 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.09.1993 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US4929276 (CHUN VICTOR L [US], et al); | [AD]US4998958 (CHUN VICTOR L [US], et al); | [AD]US5048385 (ECKERT RICHARD M [US], et al); | [AD]US4412469 (HIRATA TADASHI [JP], et al); | [X]DE3912871 (PULLMAX AB [SE]); | [X]WO8809232 (TOWER MACHINE TOOLS LIMITED [GB]); | [A]US4250785 (MORISHITA AKIO, et al); | [A]EP0396876 (BEHRENS AG C [DE]); | [A]EP0108935 (TRUMPF GMBH & CO [DE]) |