EP0553764 - Monorail suspension conveyor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/31] | Monorail system | ||
[1996/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1997 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CFC-Fördersysteme GmbH Wikingerstrasse 11 D-76189 Karlsruhe / DE | [1996/19] |
Former [1993/31] | For all designated states cfc-Fördersysteme GmbH Wikingerstrasse 11 D-76189 Karlsruhe / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wulliack, Patrick, Ing. 18, Allée Henri Barbusse 93190 Livry Gargan / FR | [1993/31] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/31] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93101126.6 | 26.01.1993 | [1993/31] | Priority number, date | DE19920000973U | 28.01.1992 Original published format: DE 9200973 U | [1993/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0553764 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0553764 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B61C13/04, B61B13/04, B62D65/00 | [1993/31] | CPC: |
B61B3/02 (EP);
B61C13/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, PT [1993/31] | Title | German: | Einschienenhängebahn | [1993/31] | English: | Monorail suspension conveyor | [1996/19] | French: | Transporteur aérien sur monorail | [1996/19] |
Former [1993/31] | Monorail system | ||
Former [1993/31] | Chemin de fer monorail | Examination procedure | 03.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/14] | 21.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1998/14] | PT | 08.08.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2045659 (STIERLEN WERKE AG); | [Y]US3774548 (BORST A); | [A]US3129671 (VANDERBECK ALFRED G); | [A]US3074354 (WAKKILA ALBERT J); | [A]FR1441383 (TOURTELLIER SA ETS); | [A]DE4002181 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) |