EP0554760 - Hydropneumatic pressure intensifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.09.1993 [1993/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOX-PRESSOTECHNIK GmbH Riedstrasse 4 D-88250 Weingarten / DE | [1993/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Malina, Viktor, Dipl.-Ing. Silcherweg 24 W-7964 Kisslegg / DE | [1993/32] | Representative(s) | Schuster, Gregor Patentanwälte Schuster & Thul Wiederholdstrasse 10 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/32] | Schuster, Gregor, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Schuster & Thul Wiederholdstrasse 10 D-70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 93101144.9 | 26.01.1993 | [1993/32] | Priority number, date | DE19924202893 | 01.02.1992 Original published format: DE 4202893 | [1993/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0554760 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F15B15/20 | [1993/32] | CPC: |
F15B11/0325 (EP);
F15B2211/216 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/32] | Title | German: | Hydropneumatischer Druckübersetzer | [1993/32] | English: | Hydropneumatic pressure intensifier | [1993/32] | French: | Multiplication de pression hydropneumatique | [1993/32] | File destroyed: | 15.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 29.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/32] | 06.07.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2287605 ; | [A]US3260167 ; | [A]EP0023030 |