EP0563524 - Optical transmission system with optical fibre amplifiers and control of the emitter wavelength [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2000 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/32] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1993/40] | For:DE
Alcatel SEL Aktiengesellschaft Lorenzstrasse 10 D-70435 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For:BE
CH
DK
ES
FR
GB
IT
LI
NL
SE
AT
ALCATEL N.V. Strawinskylaan 341, (World Trade Center) NL-1077 XX Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heidemann, Rolf, Dr. Weinsberger Weg 14 W-7146 Tamm / DE | [1993/40] | Representative(s) | Kugler, Hermann, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/40] | Kugler, Hermann, Dipl.-Phys., et al Alcatel SEL AG Patent- und Lizenzwesen Postfach 30 09 29 D-70449 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 93101264.5 | 28.01.1993 | [1993/40] | Priority number, date | DE19924208857 | 19.03.1992 Original published format: DE 4208857 | [1993/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0563524 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0563524 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/16, H01S3/06, H04B10/17 | [1998/31] | CPC: |
H04B10/2912 (EP,US);
H01S3/06758 (EP,US);
H04B10/291 (EP,US);
H04B10/504 (EP,US);
H04B10/572 (EP,US);
H04B2210/003 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/45] | H04B10/16, H01S3/06 | ||
Former IPC [1993/40] | H04B10/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/40] | Title | German: | Optisches Nachrichtenübertragungssystem mit faseroptischen Verstärkern und Regelung der Sender-Wellenlänge | [1993/40] | English: | Optical transmission system with optical fibre amplifiers and control of the emitter wavelength | [1993/40] | French: | Système de transmission optique à amplificateurs optiques et régulation de la longueur d'onde de l'émetteur | [1993/40] | Examination procedure | 19.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/03] | 06.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 13.10.1999 | DK | 13.01.2000 | AT | 28.01.2000 | BE | 31.01.2000 | CH | 31.01.2000 | LI | 31.01.2000 | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/07] | NL | 13.10.1999 | |
AT | 28.01.2000 | ||
BE | 31.01.2000 | ||
CH | 31.01.2000 | ||
LI | 31.01.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 28.01.2000 | |
BE | 31.01.2000 | ||
CH | 31.01.2000 | ||
LI | 31.01.2000 | ||
Former [2001/37] | AT | 28.01.2000 | |
BE | 31.01.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | BE | 31.01.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP1039787 ; | [A]JP63055991 ; | [A]US5088095 (ZIRNGIBL MARTIN [US]) | [Y] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS. Bd. 27, Nr. 13, 20. Juni 1991, STEVENAGE GB Seiten 1164 - 1166 M.ZIRNGIBL 'All-Optical Remote Gain Switching in Er-Doped Fibre Amplifiers' | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 232 (E-765) 29 Mai 1989 & JP-A-1 039 787 ( NEC CORP ), & JP1039787 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 277 (E-640) 30 Juli 1988 & JP-A-63 055 991 ( YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC ), & JP63055991 A 00000000 |