EP0555765 - Filling balance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1997 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.12.1997 [1997/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optima-Maschinenfabrik Dr. Bühler GmbH & Co. Steinbeisweg 20 74523 Schwäbisch Hall / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/33] | For all designated states Optima-Maschinenfabrik Dr. Bühler GmbH & Co. Steinbeisweg 20 D-74523 Schwäbisch Hall / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braun, Thomas Haldenstrasse 24 D-7170 Schwäbisch-Hall / DE | 02 /
Gwinner, Werner Hauptstrasse 40/1 D-7172 Rosengarten / DE | [1993/33] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/33] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Beier, Schöndorf und Mütschele Willy-Brandt-Strasse 28 D-70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 93101703.2 | 04.02.1993 | [1993/33] | Priority number, date | DE19924203883 | 11.02.1992 Original published format: DE 4203883 | [1993/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0555765 | Date: | 18.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0555765 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01G11/00, G01G13/02 | [1993/33] | CPC: |
G01G11/00 (EP,US);
G01G13/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/33] | Title | German: | Abfüllwaage | [1993/33] | English: | Filling balance | [1993/33] | French: | Balance de remplissage | [1993/33] | Examination procedure | 15.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/15] | 27.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2015048 (HAVER & BOECKER); | [A]DE3100577 (HAVER & BOECKER [DE]); | [X]EP0256222 (BUEHLER AG GEB [CH]) |