EP0554879 - Anti-skid brake system for wheeled vehicle and control method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/32] | Anti-skid brake system for wheeled vehicle | ||
[1998/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1999 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.10.1999 [1999/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi 2-Chome Kariya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/32] | For all designated states AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi 2-Chome Kariya City Aichi Pref. / JP | ||
For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakane, Shinsuke 21, Nakaneyama, Takaokahonmachi Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Ichikawa, Hiroyuki 11-12, Higashimyodaiji-cho Okazaki-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Fukushima, Satoru 49-2, Higashishinkiri, Shinbayashi-cho Chiryu-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 04 /
Hamada, Chiaki 527, Imazato Susono-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1993/32] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/32] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93101773.5 | 03.02.1993 | [1993/32] | Priority number, date | JP19920019187 | 04.02.1992 Original published format: JP 1918792 | [1993/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0554879 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0554879 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | [1996/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0554879 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/00 | [1993/32] | CPC: |
B60T8/17636 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/32] | Title | German: | Anti-Schlupfsystem für Kraftfahrzeuge und zugehöriges Verfahren | [1998/45] | English: | Anti-skid brake system for wheeled vehicle and control method thereof | [1998/45] | French: | Système d'anti-patinage pour véhicule à roues et procédé corresondant | [1998/45] |
Former [1993/32] | Anti-Schlupfsystem für Kraftfahrzeuge | ||
Former [1993/32] | Anti-skid brake system for wheeled vehicle | ||
Former [1993/32] | Système d'anti-patinage pour véhicule à roues | Examination procedure | 16.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/51] | 30.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3421253 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US4672547 (MASAKI SHOUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2* column W *; | [A]EP0328155 (AKEBONO BRAKE IND [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column W * |