EP0556686 - Package for photographic films [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.05.1997 [1997/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/34] | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee D-51373 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roebrock, Stefan August-Kierspel-Strasse 23 W-5060 Bergisch-Gladbach 2 / DE | 02 /
Schmitz, Gerd St.-Apern-Strasse 56-62 W-5000 Köln 1 / DE | 03 /
Lührig, Hermann, Dipl.-Ing. Heinrich-von-Kleist-Strasse 12 W-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | [1993/34] | Application number, filing date | 93101951.7 | 08.02.1993 | [1993/34] | Priority number, date | DE19924205082 | 20.02.1992 Original published format: DE 4205082 | [1993/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0556686 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0556686 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G03B17/56, G03B17/30 | [1993/34] | CPC: |
G03B17/30 (EP);
G03B17/56 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/34] | Title | German: | Verpackung für fotografische Filme | [1993/34] | English: | Package for photographic films | [1993/34] | French: | Emballage pour pellicules photographiques | [1993/34] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/45] | 23.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB214357 (LESLIE FULLERTON DAVIDSON); | [Y]CA1253089 (S & S INNOVATIVE MARKETING SER); | [Y]NL294692 ; | [YD]US4964513 (INGRAM GAYLYNN F [US], et al) |