EP0560069 - Shadow RAM cell having a shallow trench EEPROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.1997 Database last updated on 24.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.08.1997 [1997/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/37] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bergendahl, Albert Stephan RD 2 Box 683 Underhill, Vermont 05489 / US | 02 /
Bertin, Claude Louis 33 Pheasant Way South Burlington, Vermont 05403 / US | 03 /
Cronin, John Edward Box 3254 Milton, Vermont 05469 / US | 04 /
Kalter, Howard Leo 14 Village Drive Colchester, Vermont 05446 / US | 05 /
Kenney, Donald McAlpine 13 Birch Road Shelburne, Vermont 05482 / US | 06 /
Lam, Chung Hon 5 Aster Lane Williston, Vermont 05495 / US | 07 /
Lee, Hsing-San 9 Heatherbush Road Essex Junction, Vermont 05452 / US | [1993/37] | Representative(s) | Schäfer, Wolfgang IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1993/39] | Mönig, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1993/37] | Klocke, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Pascalstrasse 100 D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 93102046.5 | 10.02.1993 | [1993/37] | Priority number, date | US19920849913 | 12.03.1992 Original published format: US 849913 | [1993/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0560069 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/115, H01L29/788, H01L27/108 | [1993/37] | CPC: |
H01L29/7882 (EP,US);
H10B12/37 (EP,US);
H10B69/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/37] | Title | German: | Latente RAM-Zelle und Flachgraben-EEPROM | [1993/37] | English: | Shadow RAM cell having a shallow trench EEPROM | [1993/37] | French: | Cellule de type RAM latente ayant une EEPROM à tranchée peu profonde | [1993/37] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/09] | 05.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/34] | 21.03.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1997 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP01192164 ; | [A]JP02094564 ; | [A]JP63018663 ; | [AD]EP0083387 (IBM [US]); | [AD]EP0177816 (IBM [US]); | [A]US5017977 (RICHARDSON WILLIAM F [US]); | [A]US5020030 (HUBER ROBERT J [US]); | [A]EP0463389 (IBM [US]) |