EP0557804 - Package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.1996 [1996/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baillod, Frédéric Place du Tricentenaire 1 CH-2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds / CH | [1993/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/35] | Representative(s) | Micheli & Cie SA Rue de Genève 122 Case Postale 61 1226 Genève-Thônex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | Micheli & Cie Rue de Genève 122, Case Postale 61 CH-1226 Genève-Thonex / CH | Application number, filing date | 93102124.0 | 11.02.1993 | [1993/35] | Priority number, date | CH19920000554 | 24.02.1992 Original published format: CH 55492 | [1993/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0557804 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0557804 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/07 | [1995/40] | CPC: |
B65D43/168 (EP);
B65D77/2004 (EP);
B65D81/075 (EP);
B65D2251/1025 (EP);
B65D2251/1058 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/35] | B65D81/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [1993/35] | Title | German: | Verpackung | [1993/35] | English: | Package | [1993/35] | French: | Emballage | [1993/35] | Examination procedure | 02.11.1993 | Examination requested [1993/52] | 08.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2681142 ; | [AD]CH630313 ; | [A]US4903827 |