EP0558975 - Networked health care and monitoring system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toto Ltd. 1-1, Nakajima 2-chome Kokurakita-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 802 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/36] | For all designated states TOTO LTD. 1-1, Nakajima 2-chome Kokurakita-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 802 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alyfuku, Kiyoshi, c/o Toto Ltd. 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome, Kokura-kita-ku Kita-kyushu-shi, Fukuoka / JP | 02 /
Hiruta, Yoshiki, c/o Toto Ltd. 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome, Kokura-kita-ku Kita-kyushu-shi, Fukuoka / JP | [1993/36] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/36] | Hoffmann, Eckart, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt, Bahnhofstrasse 103 D-82166 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 93102247.9 | 12.02.1993 | [1993/36] | Priority number, date | JP19920072895 | 24.02.1992 Original published format: JP 7289592 | [1993/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0558975 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0558975 | Date: | 03.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/117, A61B5/20, A61B5/22 | [1993/36] | CPC: |
A61B5/14507 (EP,US);
A61B5/002 (EP,US);
A61B5/20 (EP,US);
A61B5/222 (EP,US);
A61B5/0022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/36] | Title | German: | Netzwerk zur Beobachtung des Gesundheitszustandes | [1993/36] | English: | Networked health care and monitoring system | [1993/36] | French: | Réseau destiné à la surveillance de l'état de santé | [1993/36] | Examination procedure | 08.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/49] | 13.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.12.1997 | BE | 03.12.1997 | CH | 03.12.1997 | DK | 03.12.1997 | ES | 03.12.1997 | FR | 03.12.1997 | GR | 03.12.1997 | IT | 03.12.1997 | LI | 03.12.1997 | NL | 03.12.1997 | IE | 12.02.1998 | LU | 12.02.1998 | PT | 03.03.1998 | SE | 03.03.1998 | MC | 31.08.1998 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/38] | AT | 03.12.1997 | |
BE | 03.12.1997 | ||
CH | 03.12.1997 | ||
ES | 03.12.1997 | ||
FR | 03.12.1997 | ||
GR | 03.12.1997 | ||
IT | 03.12.1997 | ||
LI | 03.12.1997 | ||
NL | 03.12.1997 | ||
IE | 12.02.1998 | ||
LU | 12.02.1998 | ||
PT | 03.03.1998 | ||
SE | 03.03.1998 | ||
MC | 31.08.1998 | ||
Former [2004/35] | AT | 03.12.1997 | |
BE | 03.12.1997 | ||
CH | 03.12.1997 | ||
ES | 03.12.1997 | ||
FR | 03.12.1997 | ||
GR | 03.12.1997 | ||
IT | 03.12.1997 | ||
LI | 03.12.1997 | ||
NL | 03.12.1997 | ||
IE | 12.02.1998 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
PT | 03.03.1998 | ||
SE | 03.03.1998 | ||
MC | 31.08.1998 | ||
Former [2003/18] | AT | 03.12.1997 | |
BE | 03.12.1997 | ||
CH | 03.12.1997 | ||
ES | 03.12.1997 | ||
GR | 03.12.1997 | ||
IT | 03.12.1997 | ||
LI | 03.12.1997 | ||
NL | 03.12.1997 | ||
IE | 12.02.1998 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
PT | 03.03.1998 | ||
SE | 03.03.1998 | ||
FR | 30.04.1998 | ||
MC | 31.08.1998 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 03.12.1997 | |
BE | 03.12.1997 | ||
CH | 03.12.1997 | ||
ES | 03.12.1997 | ||
GR | 03.12.1997 | ||
IT | 03.12.1997 | ||
LI | 03.12.1997 | ||
NL | 03.12.1997 | ||
IE | 12.02.1998 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
PT | 03.03.1998 | ||
SE | 03.03.1998 | ||
FR | 30.04.1998 | ||
MC | 01.09.1998 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 03.12.1997 | |
BE | 03.12.1997 | ||
CH | 03.12.1997 | ||
ES | 03.12.1997 | ||
GR | 03.12.1997 | ||
IT | 03.12.1997 | ||
LI | 03.12.1997 | ||
NL | 03.12.1997 | ||
IE | 12.02.1998 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
PT | 03.03.1998 | ||
SE | 03.03.1998 | ||
FR | 30.04.1998 | ||
MC | 31.08.1998 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 03.12.1997 | |
BE | 03.12.1997 | ||
CH | 03.12.1997 | ||
ES | 03.12.1997 | ||
GR | 03.12.1997 | ||
IT | 03.12.1997 | ||
LI | 03.12.1997 | ||
IE | 12.02.1998 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
PT | 03.03.1998 | ||
SE | 03.03.1998 | ||
FR | 30.04.1998 | ||
MC | 31.08.1998 | ||
Former [2001/01] | AT | 03.12.1997 | |
BE | 03.12.1997 | ||
CH | 03.12.1997 | ||
GR | 03.12.1997 | ||
IT | 03.12.1997 | ||
LI | 03.12.1997 | ||
IE | 12.02.1998 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
PT | 03.03.1998 | ||
SE | 03.03.1998 | ||
FR | 30.04.1998 | ||
MC | 31.08.1998 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 03.12.1997 | |
BE | 03.12.1997 | ||
CH | 03.12.1997 | ||
GR | 03.12.1997 | ||
IT | 03.12.1997 | ||
LI | 03.12.1997 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
PT | 03.03.1998 | ||
SE | 03.03.1998 | ||
FR | 30.04.1998 | ||
MC | 31.08.1998 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 03.12.1997 | |
BE | 03.12.1997 | ||
GR | 03.12.1997 | ||
IT | 03.12.1997 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
PT | 03.03.1998 | ||
SE | 03.03.1998 | ||
CH | 09.03.1998 | ||
LI | 09.03.1998 | ||
FR | 30.04.1998 | ||
MC | 31.08.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 03.12.1997 | |
BE | 03.12.1997 | ||
GR | 03.12.1997 | ||
IT | 03.12.1997 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
PT | 03.03.1998 | ||
SE | 03.03.1998 | ||
FR | 30.04.1998 | ||
MC | 31.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 03.12.1997 | |
BE | 03.12.1997 | ||
IT | 03.12.1997 | ||
PT | 03.03.1998 | ||
SE | 03.03.1998 | ||
FR | 30.04.1998 | ||
MC | 31.08.1998 | ||
Former [1998/51] | AT | 03.12.1997 | |
BE | 03.12.1997 | ||
PT | 03.03.1998 | ||
SE | 03.03.1998 | ||
FR | 30.04.1998 | ||
MC | 31.08.1998 | ||
Former [1998/46] | AT | 03.12.1997 | |
BE | 03.12.1997 | ||
PT | 03.03.1998 | ||
SE | 03.03.1998 | ||
FR | 30.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/44] | AT | 03.12.1997 | |
PT | 03.03.1998 | ||
SE | 03.03.1998 | ||
FR | 30.04.1998 | ||
Former [1998/40] | AT | 03.12.1997 | |
PT | 03.03.1998 | ||
SE | 03.03.1998 | ||
Former [1998/37] | PT | 03.03.1998 | |
SE | 03.03.1998 | ||
Former [1998/35] | SE | 03.03.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2187554 (KON ISRAEL); | [X]EP0278631 (TOTO LTD [JP]); | [XD]EP0292311 (INAX CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0323901 (INAX CORP [JP]); | [XD]US4962550 (IKENAGA TAKAO [JP], et al); | [A]DE9103737U ; | [X]US5039616 (COPELAN HERBERT W [US]) |