EP0557831 - Apparatus for determination of the optimal delivery date [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/35] | Apparatus for determination of the optimal delivery dates | ||
[1997/04] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.01.1998 [1998/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Klimek, Rudolf, Prof. Sebastiana 10/3 PL-31049 Cracow / PL | For all designated states Klimek, Marek, Dr. Szalak 15/3 PL-31161 Cracow / PL | [1994/37] |
Former [1993/35] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/37] |
Former [1993/35] | 01 /
Klimek, Rudolf, Prof. Sebastiana 10/3 PL-31049 Cracow / PL | ||
02 /
Klimek, Marek, Dr. Szlak 15/3 PL-31161 Cracow / PL | Representative(s) | Degwert, Hartmut, et al Prinz & Partner Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/04] | Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys., et al Prinz & Partner Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/37] | Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys. Prinz & Partner Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93102269.3 | 12.02.1993 | [1993/35] | Priority number, date | PL20020002936 | 25.02.1992 Original published format: PL 293602 | [1993/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0557831 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0557831 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0557831 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/00, // (G06F159/00, A61B5:11, 8:08) | [1997/04] | CPC: |
G16H50/20 (EP);
G16H50/50 (EP);
G16H10/60 (EP);
G16H40/63 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/36] | A61B5/11, G06F15/42, A61B8/08 | ||
Former IPC [1993/35] | A61B5/11 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/35] | Title | German: | Gerät zur Bestimmung des optimalen Entbindungstermins | [1993/35] | English: | Apparatus for determination of the optimal delivery date | [1997/04] | French: | Appareil pour déterminer la date d'accouchement optimale | [1997/04] |
Former [1993/35] | Apparatus for determination of the optimal delivery dates | ||
Former [1993/35] | Appareil pour déterminer les dates d'accouchement optimales | Examination procedure | 23.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/08] | 20.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0080417 (CETEHOR [FR]) [A] 1,11 * page 6, line 9 - page 9, line 14; figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB2166240 (STEPHENS JOHN D) [A] 1,11 * Zusammenfassung *; page 3, line 89 - line 101 * * page 6, line 35 - line 44; figure 2 *; | [A] - AMPARO ALONSO-BETANZOS ET AL,, "Foetos: An Expert System for Fetal Assessment", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, NEW YORK, USA, (199102), vol. 38, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1109/10.76387, pages 199 - 211, XP000229401 [A] 1 * page 200, column R, line 18 - page 209, column R, line 3; figures 1-8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/10.76387 | [A] - H.R.REY ET AL, "Computer Prediction of Neonatal Outcome and Comparison with Assessments by Physicians and Midwives", PROCEEDINGS SECOND ANNUAL IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON COMPUTER-BASED MEDICAL SYSTEMS,, MINNEAPOLIS, USA, (19890626), doi:doi:10.1109/CBMSYS.1989.47352, pages 16 - 24, XP010016736 [A] 1 * page 18, column L, line 1 - page 21, column R, line 31 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CBMSYS.1989.47352 |