EP0557898 - Improved edge card connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.1998 [1998/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOLEX INCORPORATED 2222 Wellington Court Lisle Illinois 60532-1682 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | For all designated states MOLEX INCORPORATED 2222 Wellington Court Lisle Illinois 60532-1682 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Shoji 2-4-14 B101 Narusedai Machida shi, Tokyo 194 / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Yoshihisa 2-30-3 Denen Haitsu 302 Utsukushigaoka, Midoriku 227 / JP | [1993/35] | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/17] | Blumbach, Kramer & Partner Patentanwälte, Sonnenberger Strasse 100 D-65193 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1994/35] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Sonnenberger Strasse 100 D-65193 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1993/35] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Sonnenberger Strasse 100 D-65193 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 93102622.3 | 19.02.1993 | [1993/35] | Priority number, date | US19920840421 | 24.02.1992 Original published format: US 840421 | [1993/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0557898 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0557898 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01R23/70 | [1993/35] | CPC: |
H01R12/721 (EP,US);
G06F1/00 (KR);
H01R4/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/35] | Title | German: | Steckverbinder für die Kante einer gedruckten Schaltung | [1997/05] | English: | Improved edge card connector | [1993/35] | French: | Connecteur pour la bordure d'un circuit imprimé | [1997/05] |
Former [1993/35] | Steckverbinder für die Kante der gedruckten Schaltung | ||
Former [1993/35] | Connecteur pour la bordure du circuit imprimé | Examination procedure | 08.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/11] | 19.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]DE9201757U ; | [X]DE2130729 (BUNKER RAMO); | [A]FR2386961 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]); | [A]US5002498 (TAKAHASHI HISAFUMI [JP]); | [A]EP0276924 (MOLEX INC [US]); | [AD]EP0400378 (AMP INC [US]) | Examination | EP0443493 | EP0422807 |