EP0554915 - Tapper for forming internal threads in a precision frustoconical hole in bones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vrespa, Giuseppe Via C.Battisti 26 I-20025 Legnano (Milan) / IT | [1993/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/32] | Representative(s) | Giambrocono, Alfonso, et al Giambrocono & C. S.p.A. Via Rosolino Pilo 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/32] | Giambrocono, Alfonso, Dr. Ing., et al Ing. A. Giambrocono & C. S.r.l. Via Rosolino Pilo 19/B I-20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 93102625.6 | 11.10.1990 | [1993/32] | Priority number, date | IT19890022139 | 26.10.1989 Original published format: IT 2213989 | [1993/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0554915 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0554915 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/16 | [1993/32] | CPC: |
A61C8/0025 (EP,US);
A61B17/863 (EP,US);
A61C8/0022 (EP,US);
A61C8/0089 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/32] | Title | German: | Gewindeschneideinrichtung zur Formung eines Innengewindes in einer genau kegelstumpfförmigen Bohrung eines Knochens | [1993/32] | English: | Tapper for forming internal threads in a precision frustoconical hole in bones | [1993/32] | French: | Outil de filetage pour former un filet femelle dans une forure tronconique précise d'un os | [1993/32] | Examination procedure | 19.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/32] | 23.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP90119459.7 / EP0424734 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 11.12.1996 | ES | 11.12.1996 | FR | 11.12.1996 | GR | 11.12.1996 | NL | 11.12.1996 | SE | 11.03.1997 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/32] | DK | 11.12.1996 | |
ES | 11.12.1996 | ||
FR | 11.12.1996 | ||
GR | 11.12.1996 | ||
SE | 11.03.1997 | ||
Former [2002/25] | DK | 11.12.1996 | |
ES | 11.12.1996 | ||
GR | 11.12.1996 | ||
SE | 11.03.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | DK | 11.12.1996 | |
GR | 11.12.1996 | ||
SE | 11.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 11.12.1996 | |
SE | 11.03.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | SE | 11.03.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3027138 (STRAUMANN INST AG [CH]); | [A]DE3622676 (SCHOLZ WERNER); | [A]DE3735378 (CORE VENT CORP [US]) |