EP0560131 - Partially crosslinked polymer composition from propylene copolymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.1997 | Correction of patent specification | published on 29.10.1997 [1997/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/37] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brosius, Sibylle, Dr. Cordovastrasse 29 W-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
Schwager, Harald, Dr. Ziegelofenweg 7 W-6720 Speyer / DE | 03 /
Hahn, Susanne, Dr. Friedrich-Karl-Strasse 1 W-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | 04 /
Marczinke, Bernd Lothar, Dr. Wormser Landstrasse 17 W-6720 Speyer / DE | [1993/37] | Application number, filing date | 93102916.9 | 25.02.1993 | [1993/37] | Priority number, date | DE19924207313 | 07.03.1992 Original published format: DE 4207313 | [1993/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0560131 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0560131 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/38] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0560131 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | [1997/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08F255/00, C08F8/42 | [1993/37] | CPC: |
C08F8/42 (EP,US);
C08F255/00 (EP,US);
C08F255/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F255/02, C08F230/085 (US,EP);
C08F8/42, C08F210/06 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/37] | Title | German: | Teilvernetzte Kunststoffmassen aus Propylencopolymerisaten | [1993/37] | English: | Partially crosslinked polymer composition from propylene copolymers | [1993/37] | French: | Composition de polymère partiellement réticulée à base de copolymères de propylène | [1993/37] | Examination procedure | 13.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/37] | 27.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3520151 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE]); | [A]EP0412518 (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]); | [AD]EP0134941 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG [DE]); | [AD]FR2030899 (MIDLAND SILICONES LTD, et al) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 98, no. 24, Juni 1983, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 199278y, 'CROSSLINKING POLYOLEFINS CONTAINING A VINYLSILICON COMPOUND WITH A SILANOL CONDENSATION CATALYST' Seite 36 ;Spalte 1 ; |