EP0558027 - Inter-vehicle distance detecting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.11.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.1997 [1997/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Irie, Tatsuji, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. Himeji Seisakusho, 840, Chiyoda-cho Himeji-shi, Hyogo 670 / JP | [1993/35] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93103044.9 | 26.02.1993 | [1993/35] | Priority number, date | JP19920043063 | 28.02.1992 Original published format: JP 4306392 | [1993/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0558027 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0558027 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/93 | [1993/35] | CPC: |
G01S11/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/35] | Title | German: | Entfernungsmesser für Abstand zwischen Fahrzeugen | [1993/35] | English: | Inter-vehicle distance detecting device | [1993/35] | French: | Dispositif de mesure de la distance entre véhicules | [1993/35] | Examination procedure | 28.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/47] | 25.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3642196 (MEL MIKRO ELEKTRONIK GMBH [DE]); | [A]FR2611053 (TECNOMARE SPA [IT]); | [A]US4926346 (YOKOYAMA SHOUJI [JP]); | [A]DE4006989 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]US4987357 (MASAKI ICHIRO [US]) |