EP0564811 - Flashing light device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.1996 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.1996 [1996/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adolf Nissen Elektrobau GmbH + Co KG Friedrichstädter Chaussee 4 D-25832 Tönning / DE | [1993/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peters, Okke, Dipl.-Ing. Berghof W-2251 Tetenbüll / DE | [1993/41] | Representative(s) | Niedmers, Ole propindus Patentanwälte NIEDMERS JAEGER KÖSTER Van-der-Smissen-Strasse 3 22767 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/41] | Niedmers, Ole, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwälte Niedmers & Partner Stahltwiete 23 D-22761 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 93103227.0 | 01.03.1993 | [1993/41] | Priority number, date | DE19924211948 | 06.04.1992 Original published format: DE 4211948 | [1993/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0564811 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0564811 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q7/00, F21V17/00 | [1994/25] | CPC: |
B60Q7/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/41] | B60Q7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/41] | Title | German: | Blitzleuchteneinrichtung | [1993/41] | English: | Flashing light device | [1993/41] | French: | Dispositif à lampe flash | [1993/41] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 07.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/22] | 26.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/45] | 07.06.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1996 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB194113 (JOSEPH WEBBER) [A] 7 * figures 2-3 *; | [X]DE2155684 (HAUBENWALLER HELMUT) [X] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0330392 (WEBB RONALD R) [A] 1* abstract * |