EP0585518 - Low-profile spinal fixation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.09.1998 [1998/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED SPINE FIXATION SYSTEMS, Inc. 11095 Knott Avenue, Unit L Cypress California 90630 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/10] | For all designated states ADVANCED SPINE FIXATION SYSTEMS, Inc. 11095 Knott Avenue, Unit L Cypress, California 90630 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Howland, Robert S. 560 Old Ranch Road Seal Beach, California 90740 / US | [1994/10] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/10] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93103316.1 | 02.03.1993 | [1994/10] | Priority number, date | US19920938868 | 02.09.1992 Original published format: US 938868 | [1994/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0585518 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0585518 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/60 | [1994/10] | CPC: |
A61B17/7041 (EP,US);
A61B17/701 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1994/10] | Title | German: | Wirbelsäulenhaltevorrichtung mit niedrigem Profil | [1994/10] | English: | Low-profile spinal fixation system | [1994/10] | French: | Dispositif pour fixer le rachis à profil bas | [1994/10] | Examination procedure | 25.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/43] | 25.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.10.1997 | [1998/30] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4105058 (BUNN STUART E, et al) [A] 2,6,9,11-13* abstract *; | [A]CH640689G (FRANCILLON) [A] 1,4,8,10,12,13 * page 4, column 1, line 7 - line 10; figure 2 *; | [A]FR2550289 (BARRE CARROSSERIE [FR]) [A] 1,4,8,10,12,13 * abstract *; | [AD]US5030220 (HOWLAND ROBERT S [US]) [AD] 1,4,8,10,12,13 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US5057109 (OLERUD SVEN [SE]) [A] 1,4,8,10,12,13 * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 13; figures 1,4 *; | [A]EP0465158 (MEHDIAN SEYED MOHAMMAD HOSSEIN [GB]) [A] 1,4,8,10,12,13 * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 28; figures 3,4,6 * |