EP0561214 - Diaminoalkanes, process for their manufacture and fuels and lubricants containing these diaminoalkanes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.07.1997 [1997/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/38] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mohr, Juergen, Dr. Hochgewanne 48 W-6718 Gruenstadt / DE | 02 /
Oppenlaender, Knut, Dr. Otto-Dill-Strasse 23 W-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
Franz, Lothar, Dr. Pfalzring 198 W-6704 Mutterstadt / DE | 04 /
Schreyer, Peter, Dr. Karillonstrasse 12 W-6940 Weinheim / DE | 05 /
Thomas, Juergen, Dr. Merowinger Strasse 5 W-6701 Fussgoenheim / DE | [1993/38] | Application number, filing date | 93103365.8 | 03.03.1993 | [1993/38] | Priority number, date | DE19924208756 | 19.03.1992 Original published format: DE 4208756 | [1993/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0561214 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0561214 | Date: | 27.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0561214 | Date: | 10.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/32, C10L1/22, C10M133/54, C10M133/58 | [1993/38] | CPC: |
C08F8/32 (EP,US);
C10L1/238 (EP,US);
C10L1/2383 (EP,US);
C10L1/2387 (EP,US);
C10L10/04 (EP,US);
C10L10/06 (EP,US);
C10M133/54 (EP,US);
C10M133/58 (EP,US);
C10M2215/04 (EP,US);
C10M2215/042 (EP,US);
C10M2215/22 (EP,US);
C10M2215/221 (EP,US);
C10M2215/225 (EP,US);
C10M2215/226 (EP,US);
C10M2215/26 (EP,US);
C10M2215/30 (EP,US);
C10M2217/046 (EP,US);
C10M2217/06 (EP,US);
C10N2040/25 (EP,US);
C10N2040/251 (EP,US);
C10N2040/255 (EP,US);
C10N2040/28 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/32, C08F8/08, C08F110/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1993/38] | Title | German: | Diaminoalkane, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung sowie Kraftstoffe und Schmierstoffe, enthaltend die Diaminoalkane | [1993/38] | English: | Diaminoalkanes, process for their manufacture and fuels and lubricants containing these diaminoalkanes | [1993/38] | French: | Diaminoalcanes, leur procédé de préparation et combustibles et lubrifiants contenant des diaminoalcanes | [1993/38] | Examination procedure | 23.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/46] | 26.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4156061 (JACOBSON NORMAN [US], et al); | [A]WO9008787 (AMOCO CORP [US]); | [AD]DE3611230 (BASF AG [DE]); | [XP]EP0476485 (BASF AG [DE]) |