EP0568783 - Cathode-ray tube apparatus and yoke [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/39] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1993/45] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okuyama, Nobutaka 36-9-602, Hirado-5-chome Totsuka-ku, Yokohama-shi / JP | 02 /
Sakurai, Soichi Dorimu Haitsu 5-801, 1403, Matanocho Totsuka-ku, Yokohama-shi / JP | 03 /
Kitou, Kouji Sezaru Kamiooka 405, 6-7, Higashiserigaya Konan-ku, Yokohama-shi / JP | 04 /
Oguro, Hiroki Hitachi Fujimiryo, 1545, Yoshidacho Totsuka-ku, Yokohama-shi / JP | 05 /
Yoshimi, Isao 17-11, Tobudai-1-chome Mobara-shi / JP | 06 /
Obara, Masao Konandai Purinsu Haitsu 3-114, 262-32, Kamigocho Sakae-ku, Yokohama-shi / JP | 07 /
Ohsawa, Michitaka 12-15, Fujisawa-4-chome Fujisawa-shi / JP | 08 /
Fukuma, Kouji Mitakeryo, 1545, Yoshidacho Totsuka-ku, Yokohama-shi / JP | 09 /
Majima, Kazuo 348-22, Shimonagayoshi Mobara-shi / JP | 10 /
Yoshiwara, Yoshio 68-32, Kaminagayoshi Mobara-shi / JP | 11 /
Furuya, Minoru 150-3, Maenakano Odaki, Esashi-shi / JP | [1993/45] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/45] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner, Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93103424.3 | 03.03.1993 | [1993/45] | Priority number, date | JP19920115895 | 08.05.1992 Original published format: JP 11589592 | JP19920211209 | 07.08.1992 Original published format: JP 21120992 | [1993/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0568783 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0568783 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/00, H01J29/86 | [1993/45] | CPC: |
H01J29/003 (EP,US);
H01J29/76 (KR);
H01J29/867 (EP,US);
H01J2229/0015 (EP,US);
H01S3/08086 (EP,US);
H01S3/2383 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, SE [1993/45] | Title | German: | Kathodenstrahlröhre mit Ablenkjoch | [1993/45] | English: | Cathode-ray tube apparatus and yoke | [1993/45] | French: | Tube à rayons cathodiques avec bobine de déviation | [1993/45] | Examination procedure | 03.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/45] | 08.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 31.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0523741 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [XP]DE4123565 ; | [A]US5066891 (HARROLD WILLIAM J [US], et al); | [A]WO8806346 (HANTAREX SPA [IT]) |