EP0567743 - Method and device for filling packages, especially paper bags or paper sacks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DE | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Icoma FBS GmbH Packtechnik Fautenbacher Strasse 26 D-77855 Achern / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/51] | For all designated states icoma FBS GmbH Packtechnik Fautenbacher Strasse 26 D-77855 Achern / DE | ||
Former [1993/44] | For all designated states Icoma Packtechnik GmbH Fautenbacher Strasse 26 D-77855 Achern / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hansson, Per-Ulf Fautenbacher Strasse 24 7590 Achern / DE | 02 /
Kuckhermann, Gustav Goethestrasse 24 4540 Lengerich / DE | [1993/44] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Thielking & Elbertzhagen Gadderbaumer Strasse 14 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Bodo Thielking Dipl.-Ing. Otto Elbertzhagen Gadderbaumer Strasse 20 D-33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 93103512.5 | 05.03.1993 | [1993/44] | Priority number, date | DE19924213772 | 27.04.1992 Original published format: DE 4213772 | [1993/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0567743 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0567743 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65B39/12 | [1993/44] | CPC: |
B65B39/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Befüllen von Verpackungen, insbesondere Papiersäcken oder Papierbeuteln | [1993/44] | English: | Method and device for filling packages, especially paper bags or paper sacks | [1993/44] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour remplir des emballages, spécialement des sacs en papier | [1993/44] | Examination procedure | 01.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/48] | 24.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 15.01.1997 | ES | 15.01.1997 | FR | 15.01.1997 | IT | 15.01.1997 | AT | 05.03.1997 | SE | 06.03.1997 | BE | 31.03.1997 | DE | 31.03.1997 | GB | 15.04.1997 | NL | 01.10.1997 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/35] | DK | 15.01.1997 | |
ES | 15.01.1997 | ||
FR | 15.01.1997 | ||
IT | 15.01.1997 | ||
AT | 05.03.1997 | ||
SE | 06.03.1997 | ||
BE | 31.03.1997 | ||
GB | 15.04.1997 | ||
NL | 01.10.1997 | ||
Former [2002/25] | DK | 15.01.1997 | |
ES | 15.01.1997 | ||
IT | 15.01.1997 | ||
AT | 05.03.1997 | ||
SE | 06.03.1997 | ||
BE | 31.03.1997 | ||
GB | 15.04.1997 | ||
FR | 13.06.1997 | ||
NL | 01.10.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | DK | 15.01.1997 | |
IT | 15.01.1997 | ||
AT | 05.03.1997 | ||
SE | 06.03.1997 | ||
BE | 31.03.1997 | ||
GB | 15.04.1997 | ||
FR | 13.06.1997 | ||
NL | 01.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/41] | DK | 15.01.1997 | |
AT | 05.03.1997 | ||
SE | 06.03.1997 | ||
BE | 31.03.1997 | ||
GB | 15.04.1997 | ||
FR | 13.06.1997 | ||
NL | 01.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/40] | BE | 15.01.1997 | |
DK | 15.01.1997 | ||
AT | 05.03.1997 | ||
SE | 06.03.1997 | ||
GB | 15.04.1997 | ||
FR | 13.06.1997 | ||
NL | 01.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/16] | BE | 15.01.1997 | |
DK | 15.01.1997 | ||
SE | 06.03.1997 | ||
GB | 15.04.1997 | ||
FR | 13.06.1997 | ||
NL | 01.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 15.01.1997 | |
DK | 15.01.1997 | ||
SE | 06.03.1997 | ||
GB | 15.04.1997 | ||
FR | 13.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | BE | 15.01.1997 | |
SE | 06.03.1997 | ||
FR | 13.06.1997 | ||
Former [1997/49] | BE | 15.01.1997 | |
FR | 13.06.1997 | ||
Former [1997/44] | FR | 13.06.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | GB758379 [ ] (ROSE BROTHERS LTD); | DE1586246 [ ] (ROVEMA GMBH); | DE2400151 [ ] (TRIEB PETER) | Examination | DE2400153 |