EP0562332 - Instrument panel with light intensity and colour variation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIAT AUTO S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli 200 10135 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | For all designated states FIAT AUTO S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli 200 I-10135 Torino / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Di Giusto, Nevio Via Vanchiglia, 24 I-10100 Torino / IT | [1993/39] | Representative(s) | Di Francesco, Gianni, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | Di Francesco, Gianni, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 I-10128 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 93103558.8 | 05.03.1993 | [1993/39] | Priority number, date | IT1992TO00270 | 26.03.1992 Original published format: IT TO920270 | [1993/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0562332 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0562332 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q3/04, B60K37/02, G01D11/28 | [1993/39] | CPC: |
G01D11/28 (EP);
B60K35/60 (EP);
B60Q3/14 (EP);
B60Q3/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/39] | Title | German: | Helligkeits- und farbenveränderbare Armaturenbeleuchtung | [1993/39] | English: | Instrument panel with light intensity and colour variation | [1993/39] | French: | Tableau de bord à couleur et luminosité variable | [1993/39] | Examination procedure | 25.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/47] | 22.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 13.09.1995 | SE | 13.12.1995 | [2002/25] |
Former [1996/23] | SE | 13.12.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP03061136 ; | [Y]US4012632 (STONE FRANKLIN P); | [Y]GB2018485 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]EP0116672 (GRUNDIG EMV [DE]); | [A]EP0351259 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al); | [A]EP0382880 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]); | [A]GB2237385 (DELCO ELECTRONIC OVERSEAS CORP [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 215 (M-1119)31 May 1991 & JP-A-03 061136 ( MAZDA MOTOR CORP. ) 15 March 1991, & JP03061136 A 19910315 |