EP0561236 - An aqueous ammonia composition for the cleaning of semi-conductor substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2001 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.01.2002 [2002/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 7-1, Kanda-Nishiki-cho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Kanto Kagaku Kabushiki Kaisha 2-8, Nihonbashihoncho 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/38] | For all designated states NISSAN CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. 7-1, Kanda-Nishiki-cho 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states KANTO KAGAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-8, Nihonbashihoncho 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morikawa, Fumihiro, c/o Nissan Chem. Ind., Ltd. Toyama-Kojo, 635, Sasakura Fuchumachi, Nei-gun, Toyama-ken / JP | 02 /
Yoshikawa, Akihisa, c/o Nissan Chem. Ind., Ltd. Toyama-Kojo, 635, Sasakura Fuchumachi, Nei-gun, Toyama-ken / JP | 03 /
Ishikawa, Norio, c/o Kanto Kagaku K.K. Chuo-Kenkyusho, 1-7-1, Inari Soka-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Shihoya, Takao, c/o Kanto Kagaku K.K. 2-8, Nihonbashihoncho 3-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1993/38] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/38] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER P.O. Box 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93103573.7 | 05.03.1993 | [1993/38] | Priority number, date | JP19920097516 | 06.03.1992 Original published format: JP 9751692 | [1993/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0561236 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0561236 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/306 | [1993/38] | CPC: |
H01L21/02052 (EP,US);
C11D10/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/38] | Title | German: | Wässrige, Ammoniak enthaltende, Zusammensetzung für die Reinigung von Halbleitersubstraten | [1993/38] | English: | An aqueous ammonia composition for the cleaning of semi-conductor substrates | [1993/38] | French: | Composition aqueuse à base d'ammoniaque pour le nettoyage de substrats semi-conducteurs | [1993/38] | Examination procedure | 02.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/17] | 19.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.07.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP1014924 ; | [Y]EP0416126 (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP], et al) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 195 (E-754)10 May 1989 & JP-A-10 14 924 ( MITSUBISHI GAS ), & JP1014924 A 19890510 | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SEMICONDUCTOR MANUFACTURING vol. 2, no. 3, August 1989, NEW YORK US pages 69 - 75 MISHIMA ET AL 'Particle-free wafer cleaning and drying technology' | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY vol. 137, no. 4, April 1990, MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE US pages 1239 - 1243 VAN DEN MEERAKKER ET AL 'A mechanistic study of silicon etching in NH3/H2O2 cleaning solutions' | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 26, no. 12, May 1984, NEW YORK US pages 6456 - 6457 CAZCARRA ET AL 'Improvements to surface characteristics of silicon wafers' | Examination | JPH02285051 | - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 00, Database accession no. 91-011695, & JPH02285051 A 00000000 |