EP0565852 - Optimal scan sequence for RF magnetic digitizers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.10.2000 [2000/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Russell, Gregory Fraser 235 Cherry Road Yorktown Heights, New York 10598 / US | [1993/42] | Representative(s) | Teufel, Fritz, et al IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht 71137 Ehningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | Teufel, Fritz, Dipl.-Phys., et al IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht 70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1994/38] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1993/42] | Mönig, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH, Patentwesen und Urheberrecht D-70548 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 93103648.7 | 08.03.1993 | [1993/42] | Priority number, date | US19920869564 | 15.04.1992 Original published format: US 869564 | [1993/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0565852 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0565852 | Date: | 27.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06K11/16 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
G06F3/046 (EP,US);
G06F3/03 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/42] | Title | German: | Optimale Abtastsequenz für RF magnetische Digitalisiergeräte | [1993/42] | English: | Optimal scan sequence for RF magnetic digitizers | [1993/42] | French: | Séquence de balayage optimale pour numériseurs magnétiques RF | [1993/42] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/09] | 09.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2054300 (TALOS SYSTEMS); | [A]US4368352 (DAVIS ROBERT); | [A]EP0333372 (AMETEK INC [US]) |