EP0563627 - Anti-tumor method and anti-tumor agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.1996 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.1996 [1996/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIO DEFENCE INSTITUTE CO., LTD. Syouei-kannai Building, 22, Sumiyoshi-cho 2-chome, Naka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/40] | For all designated states BIO DEFENCE INSTITUTE CO., LTD. Syouei-kannai Building, 22, Sumiyoshi-cho 2-chome, Naka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Egawa, Kohji 1-11, Kamiyouga 3-chome, Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sato, Ichiei 2413, Ishihara-cho Takasaki-shi, Gunma / JP | [1993/40] | Representative(s) | Hering, Hartmut Patentanwälte Berendt, Leyh & Hering Innere Wiener Strasse 20 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/40] | Hering, Hartmut, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Berendt, Leyh & Hering Innere Wiener Strasse 20 D-81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93103650.3 | 05.03.1993 | [1993/40] | Priority number, date | JP19920048840 | 05.03.1992 Original published format: JP 4884092 | [1993/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0563627 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0563627 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K37/02, A61K39/395, A61K35/14, A61K35/28, // C12N15/12, C12P21/08 | [1993/40] | CPC: |
C07K14/4748 (EP,KR);
A61K38/00 (EP,KR);
A61K39/46 (EP,KR);
A61K39/461 (EP,KR);
A61K39/4644 (EP,KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K14/70539 (EP,KR);
C07K16/30 (EP,KR);
G01N33/57492 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/40] | Title | German: | Antitumorverfahren und Antitumormittel | [1993/40] | English: | Anti-tumor method and anti-tumor agent | [1993/40] | French: | Méthode antitumorale et agent antitumoral | [1993/40] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 25.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/38] | 06.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/17] | 20.11.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0352761 (BEHRINGWERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A] - HOLMES, N., "New HLA class I molecules", IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, CAMBRIDGE UK, (1989), vol. 10, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/0167-5699(89)90305-8, pages 52 - 53, XP023938214 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0167-5699(89)90305-8 |