EP0560249 - Prosthesis for the correction of flatfoot [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOWMEDICA INTERNATIONAL Div.ne PFIZER ITALIANA S.p.A. S.S. 156 km 50 I-04100 Borgo San Michele-Latina / IT | [1993/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giannini, Sandro Piazza D'Azeglio, 7 I-55049 Viareggio / IT | [1993/37] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/37] | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta, Via Viotti, 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 93103674.3 | 08.03.1993 | [1993/37] | Priority number, date | IT1992LU00001U | 09.03.1992 Original published format: IT LU920001 U | [1993/37] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0560249 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0560249 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/42, A61L27/00 | [1993/37] | CPC: |
A61B17/562 (EP,US);
A61F2/4202 (EP,US);
A61L27/18 (EP,US);
A61L27/58 (EP,US);
A61L31/06 (EP,US);
A61L31/148 (EP,US);
A61B17/68 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00004 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30062 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30433 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30579 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4223 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L27/18, C08L67/04 (EP,US);
A61L31/06, C08L67/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/37] | Title | German: | Prothese für die Plattfusskorrektur | [1993/37] | English: | Prosthesis for the correction of flatfoot | [1993/37] | French: | Prothèse pour la correction de pieds plats | [1993/37] | Examination procedure | 22.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/19] | 18.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.04.1996 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   04.04.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 30.07.1997 | DK | 30.07.1997 | ES | 30.07.1997 | GR | 30.07.1997 | NL | 30.07.1997 | SE | 30.10.1997 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | BE | 30.07.1997 | |
DK | 30.07.1997 | ||
ES | 30.07.1997 | ||
GR | 30.07.1997 | ||
SE | 30.10.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | BE | 30.07.1997 | |
DK | 30.07.1997 | ||
GR | 30.07.1997 | ||
SE | 30.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/21] | BE | 30.07.1997 | |
DK | 30.07.1997 | ||
SE | 30.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 30.07.1997 | |
SE | 30.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | SE | 30.10.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4450591 (RAPPAPORT MARK J [US]); | [A]FR2543821 (VILADOT PERICE ANTONIO [ES]); | [Y]DE3509417 (EWERS GEB GOOS HILDEGUND DR); | [A]EP0401844 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM KG [DE], et al); | [A]DE4000112 (FATH BRUNO [DE], et al) |